Hogan v. Marshall County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners et al

Plaintiff: Brett F. Hogan
Defendant: David Baier, Daniel A. Hargrave, Marshall County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners and Timothy Anderson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02040
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER cancelling Scheduling conference set for 4/1/19 @ 9:00 AM. Entered by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 3/22/19. Mailed to pro se party Brett F. Hogan by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(msb)
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A redacted version of Exhibit A to document #16 Response to Motion has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes ONLY. (tvn)
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT to #16 Response to Motion by Defendants Timothy Anderson, David Baier, Daniel A. Hargrave, Marshall County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners. (Wolpink, Jeannette)
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Defendants Timothy Anderson, David Baier, Daniel A. Hargrave, Marshall County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners re #15 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolpink, Jeannette) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2019: #2 Redacted Exhibit A) (tvn).
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Brett F. Hogan (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
February 15, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED due to case type/case reassignment as to: #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(kao)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow for all further proceedings. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara no longer assigned to case. Entered by Deputy Clerk on 02/15/19. Mailed to pro se party Brett F. Hogan by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Timothy Anderson, David Baier, Daniel A. Hargrave, Marshall County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners(Wolpink, Jeannette)
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Timothy Anderson, David Baier, Daniel A. Hargrave, Marshall County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners. (Wolpink, Jeannette)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiffs Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Brett F. Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 Amended PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Brett F. Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hw)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #8 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Timothy Anderson, David Baier, Daniel A. Hargrave, Marshall County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners(Wolpink, Jeannette)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Timothy Anderson, David Baier, Daniel A. Hargrave, Marshall County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners (Wolpink, Jeannette)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2019 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. All parties participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. A copy of this notice along with the initial order setting scheduling conference was mailed to plaintiff by regular mail.(ss)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2019 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 3/22/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 3/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/12/19. (ss)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Timothy Anderson, David Baier, Daniel A. Hargrave, Marshall County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners.(Wolpink, Jeannette)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Amended NOTICE of Removal by Timothy Anderson, David Baier, Daniel A. Hargrave, Marshall County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wolpink, Jeannette)
January 25, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Timothy Anderson, David Baier, Daniel A. Hargrave, Marshall County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Seck, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Timothy Anderson, David Baier, Daniel Hargrave, Marshall County Board of County Commissioners. (Seck, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marshall County District Court, case number 2019-CV-000001 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4693792.), filed by Marshall County Board of County Commissioners, David Baier, Timothy Anderson, Daniel Hargrave. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Seck, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan v. Marshall County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett F. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Baier
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Represented By: Jeannette L. Wolpink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A. Hargrave
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Represented By: Jeannette L. Wolpink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Represented By: Jeannette L. Wolpink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Anderson
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Represented By: Jeannette L. Wolpink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?