Hendricks v. Rasmussen College, Inc.
Plaintiff: Denise Hendricks
Defendant: Rasmussen College, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02043
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by April 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 03/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Rasmussen College, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Russell, Kyle)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kyle B. Russell on behalf of Rasmussen College, Inc. (Russell, Kyle)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Denise Hendricks upon Rasmussen College, Inc. served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019 (Brown, Charles)
January 25, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rasmussen College, Inc.. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
January 25, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Denise Hendricks. (Brown, Charles)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4694573.), filed by Denise Hendricks.(Brown, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks v. Rasmussen College, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Hendricks
Represented By: Jayson A. Watkins
Represented By: Charles Jason Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasmussen College, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?