Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund et al v. Smedley Company, The
Plaintiff: Boilermakers National Health & Welfare Fund, Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, John Fultz, Dale Branscum, II, Boilermakers' Apprenticeship and Training Funds, Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund The, Boilermakers National Annuity Trust and Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund, The
Defendant: The Smedley Company and Smedley Company, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv02061
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendant The Smedley Company (ses)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION FOR CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, Boilermakers National Annuity Trust, Boilermakers National Health & Welfare Fund, Boilermakers' Apprenticeship and Training Funds, Dale Branscum, II, John Fultz, Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund, The. (Brown, Scott)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund, The, Boilermakers National Annuity Trust, Dale Branscum, II, Boilermakers National Health & Welfare Fund, Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, Boilermakers' Apprenticeship and Training Funds, John Fultz upon Smedley Company, The served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019 (Brown, Scott)
February 4, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Smedley Company. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
February 4, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, Boilermakers National Annuity Trust, Boilermakers National Health & Welfare Fund, Boilermakers' Apprenticeship and Training Funds, Dale Branscum, II, John Fultz, Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund The. (Brown, Scott)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4703616.), filed by Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund The, Boilermakers National Annuity Trust, Dale Branscum, II, Boilermakers National Health & Welfare Fund, Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, Boilermakers' Apprenticeship and Training Funds, John Fultz.(Brown, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund et al v. Smedley Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boilermakers National Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fultz
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Branscum, II
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boilermakers' Apprenticeship and Training Funds
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund The
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boilermakers National Annuity Trust
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund, The
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Smedley Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smedley Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?