Murphy v. Holman Automotive Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin A. Murphy
Defendant: Holman Automotive Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02086
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay Proceedings and Application for Arbitration. Plaintiff has responded that he does not object to Defendant's motion [Doc. 9]. The parties shall file a status report on or before 10/11/2019 advising the Court of the status of the arbitration proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lml)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Kevin A. Murphy re #7 MOTION to Stay Case and Application for Arbitration and notice of non-objection (Robertson, Matthew)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Holman Automotive Group, Inc. identifying Kuni Enterprises, LLC as corporate parent . (Kelly, Bryan)
March 18, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #7 MOTION to Stay Case and Application for Arbitration. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Case and Application for Arbitration by Defendant Holman Automotive Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boos, Brian)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response. Holman Automotive Group, Inc. has until 3/14/2019 to file an Answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/8/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Holman Automotive Group, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Kelly, Bryan) Modified motion type on 3/8/2019 (tvn).
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Kevin A. Murphy upon Holman Automotive Group, Inc. served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stecklein, Alan)
February 13, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Holman Automotive Group, Inc.. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
February 13, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Kevin A. Murphy - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Stecklein, Alan)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kevin A. Murphy. (Stecklein, Alan)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4713640.), filed by Kevin A. Murphy.(Stecklein, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Holman Automotive Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin A. Murphy
Represented By: Alan J. Stecklein
Represented By: Matthew S. Robertson
Represented By: Michael H. Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holman Automotive Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brian G. Boos
Represented By: Bryan Ross Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?