Schlup et al v. Depositors Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Michel Schlup and Michel L. Schlup Revocable Trust Dated June 2, 2010
Defendant: Depositors Insurance Company and AMCO Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02095
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
0 Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
1 Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kathleen Marie Hart for AMCO Insurance Company and Depositors Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/13/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dennis Ventura for AMCO Insurance Company and Depositors Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/13/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Kathleen M. Hart to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4740188.) by Defendants AMCO Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Rice, Thomas)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Dennis N. Ventura to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4740186.) by Defendants AMCO Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Rice, Thomas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk regarding #10 Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling: The docket text has been modified to correctly indicate the scheduling conference set for 5/7/19 at 10:00 a.m. will be held BY TELEPHONE. Please disregard the previous indication as to Courtroom. See Docket Entry #10 for call in instructions. THIS IS FOR NOTICING PURPOSES ONLY. (alm)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 4/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/5/19. (alm) Modified on 3/6/2019 to indicate conference by phone (alm).
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by AMCO Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company.(Rice, Thomas)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of Copies of State Court Records by AMCO Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - part 1, #2 Exhibit A - part 2, #3 Exhibit A - part 3)(Kellogg, John)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia for all further proceedings. Signed by deputy clerk on 02/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John L. Kellogg on behalf of AMCO Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company. (Kellogg, John)
February 20, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Depositors Insurance Company . (Rice, Thomas)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Depositors Insurance Company AMCO Insurance Company. (Rice, Thomas)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Depositors Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Rice, Thomas)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Depositors Insurance Company. (Rice, Thomas)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, case number 19-cv-00162 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4717436.), filed by Depositors Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit b - Part 2)(Rice, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schlup et al v. Depositors Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depositors Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis Ventura
Represented By: John L. Kellogg
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis Ventura
Represented By: John L. Kellogg
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel Schlup
Represented By: Brennan P. Fagan
Represented By: Mark T. Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel L. Schlup Revocable Trust Dated June 2, 2010
Represented By: Brennan P. Fagan
Represented By: Mark T. Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?