Johnson et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kristina Johnson and Cliff Palifrone
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02118
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay Case - Agreed Motion to Stay All Proceedings Except for Pending Submissions Relating to Leadership Disputes Amongst Plaintiffs' Counsel by Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Wieland, Jennifer)
April 12, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel (Wieland, Jennifer)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Laurence Paskowitz for Kristina Johnson,Laurence Paskowitz for Cliff Palifrone pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/4/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David Nathan Lake for Kristina Johnson,David Nathan Lake for Cliff Palifrone pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/4/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Laurence Paskowitz to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4765376.) by Plaintiffs Kristina Johnson, Cliff Palifrone (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Coykendall, Robert)
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney David N. Lake to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4765353.) by Plaintiffs Kristina Johnson, Cliff Palifrone (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Coykendall, Robert)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 motion for extension of time for defendant to respond to the Motion to Consolidate Cases and for the Appointment of Interim Class Counsel (ECF No. 4). The court agrees with defendant that efficiency would be served by permitting defendant to file a single coordinated response in the five related cases against defendant that the court is considering for consolidation. Therefore, as in the other four cases, defendant's response deadline on the request for consolidation is April 12, 2019. Defendant's response deadline on the issue of the appointment of interim class counsel is indefinitely extended; it will be set after the court decides the question of consolidation. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/2/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel by Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 4/1/19 emails between Hannah Chanoine and Larry Paskowitz, #2 Exhibit 2 - 3/30/19 Letter)(Wieland, Jennifer)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant's answer or response to plaintiff's complaint shall be due 30 days after the JPML's ruling on the pending motion to consolidate and transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 03/27/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Y. Chanoine for Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/27/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Hannah Y. Chanoine to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4754956.) by Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Wieland, Jennifer)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wieland, Jennifer)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer B. Wieland on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Wieland, Jennifer)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas P. Schult on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Schult, Thomas)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Consolidate and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel by Kristina Johnson, Cliff Palifrone. (Coykendall, Robert)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel by Plaintiffs Kristina Johnson, Cliff Palifrone (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Coykendall, Robert)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kristina Johnson, Cliff Palifrone upon Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019 (Coykendall, Robert)
March 4, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
March 4, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Kristina Johnson, Cliff Palifrone. (Coykendall, Robert)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4730678.), filed by Kristina Johnson, Cliff Palifrone.(Coykendall, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Johnson
Represented By: Robert W. Coykendall
Represented By: David Nathan Lake
Represented By: Laurence Paskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliff Palifrone
Represented By: Robert W. Coykendall
Represented By: David Nathan Lake
Represented By: Laurence Paskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?