Johnson et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.

Plaintiff: Angelina Raines, David Johnson and Kayla Vanwinsen
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02121
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #11 Order re Motion to Consolidate and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel, D. Kan. No. 19-2118, by Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Wieland, Jennifer)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs David Johnson, Kayla Vanwinsen, Angelina Raines re #11 Order (Edgar, John)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Response to this Order should be filed on or before 4/12/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/29/19. (aw)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Y. Chanoine for Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/28/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer of Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. due on or before 6/28/2019. Defendant asked for the date to be extended until "30 days from the date when the JPML rules on the pending motion to consolidate and transfer." The Court is not inclined to enter an Order than lacks a specific deadline. Defendant may move for additional time if the matter has not been resolved with sufficient time for Defendant to answer by June 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/28/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Wieland, Jennifer)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Hannah Y. Chanoine to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4755040.) by Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Wieland, Jennifer)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer B. Wieland on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Wieland, Jennifer)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas P. Schult on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Schult, Thomas)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: Motion for Consolidation has been filed in related case 19-2118 (#4). (hw)
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by David Johnson, Kayla Vanwinsen, Angelina Raines upon Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019 (Edgar, John)
March 6, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs David Johnson, Angelina Raines, Kayla Vanwinsen. (Edgar, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4732870.), filed by David Johnson, Kayla Vanwinsen, Angelina Raines.(Edgar, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Raines
Represented By: Brendan McNeal
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Johnson
Represented By: Brendan McNeal
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Vanwinsen
Represented By: Brendan McNeal
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?