Murray v. Manorcare of Topeka KS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles Murray
Defendant: Manorcare of Topeka KS, LLC, HCR Manorcare, Inc., ProMedica Health System, Inc and HCR Healthcare, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02148
Filed: March 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA by Charles Murray Subpoena to be issued to: ABT Associates, Inc. (Steele, Jonathan)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time seven days. Discovery deadline 8/3/2020. Dispositive motion deadline 9/4/2020. Mediation deadline 7/3/2020. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 6/5/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/11/2020. Jury Trial set for 5/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. See attached Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/27/19. (aw)
June 25, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/24/19. (aw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by HCR Healthcare, LLC, HCR Manorcare, Inc., Manorcare of Topeka KS, LLC (McDonald, Ted)
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Charles Murray of Rule 26 Disclosures (Steele, Jonathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by HCR Manorcare, Inc.. (McDonald, Ted)
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint (attorney) by HCR Healthcare, LLC. (McDonald, Ted)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by ProMedica Health System, Inc.(McDonald, Ted)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint (attorney) by Manorcare of Topeka KS, LLC. (McDonald, Ted)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 for the conference. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/20/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/20/2019. (NOTE: As indicated in the Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling, copies of the parties' initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) must be attached to the parties' completed Rule 26(f) planning report. These disclosures will be discussed with the magistrate judge during the upcoming scheduling conference in finalizing a discovery and case plan that achieves the objectives of Rule 1.) See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/10/19. (aw)
May 6, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HCR Healthcare, LLC (McDonald, Ted)
May 6, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HCR Manorcare, Inc. (McDonald, Ted)
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by HCR Manorcare, Inc..(McDonald, Ted)
May 6, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ted J. McDonald, III on behalf of HCR Manorcare, Inc. (McDonald, Ted)
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by HCR Healthcare, LLC.(McDonald, Ted)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ted J. McDonald, III on behalf of HCR Healthcare, LLC (McDonald, Ted)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ProMedica Health System, Inc (McDonald, Ted)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by ProMedica Health System, Inc.(McDonald, Ted)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ted J. McDonald, III on behalf of ProMedica Health System, Inc (McDonald, Ted)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Manorcare of Topeka KS, LLC (McDonald, Ted)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Manorcare of Topeka KS, LLC.(McDonald, Ted)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ted J. McDonald, III on behalf of Manorcare of Topeka KS, LLC (McDonald, Ted)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Priority Mail Return Receipt by Charles Murray upon HCR Healthcare, LLC served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019; HCR Manorcare, Inc. served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019 (Steele, Jonathan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Priority Mail Return Receipt by Charles Murray upon Manorcare of Topeka KS, LLC served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019; ProMedica Health System, Inc served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019 (Steele, Jonathan)
April 2, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HCR Healthcare, LLC, HCR Manorcare, Inc., Manorcare of Topeka KS, LLC, ProMedica Health System, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
March 18, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 16, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Charles Murray - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Steele, Jonathan)
March 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Charles Murray. (Steele, Jonathan)
March 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4744071.), filed by Charles Murray.(Steele, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Manorcare of Topeka KS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manorcare of Topeka KS, LLC
Represented By: Ted J. McDonald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR Manorcare, Inc.
Represented By: Ted J. McDonald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProMedica Health System, Inc
Represented By: Ted J. McDonald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Ted J. McDonald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Murray
Represented By: Jonathan T. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?