Yanez-Dominguez v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Alma R. Yanez-Dominguez
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company, The and Cincinnati Casualty Company, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv02155
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER OF SUBTITUTION granting #12 Motion to Substitute Party. The Cincinnati Casualty Company added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/17/2019. (sz)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant by Plaintiff Alma R. Yanez-Dominguez (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Taylor, Donald)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The identifying Cincinnati Financial Corporation as corporate parent . (Kuckelman, Karl)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 7/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/31/19. (alm)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company, The - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Kuckelman, Karl)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Kuckelman, Karl)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The.(Kuckelman, Karl)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Karl Kuckelman on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Kuckelman, Karl)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alma R. Yanez-Dominguez. Cincinnati Insurance Company, The waiver sent on 3/26/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Taylor, Donald)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Alma R. Yanez-Dominguez - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Taylor, Donald)
March 22, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 22, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Alma R. Yanez-Dominguez. (Taylor, Donald)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Alma R. Yanez-Dominguez. (Taylor, Donald)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4750597.), filed by Alma R. Yanez-Dominguez.(Taylor, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yanez-Dominguez v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Karl Kuckelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Casualty Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma R. Yanez-Dominguez
Represented By: Donald T. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?