Browne v. Scott et al
Plaintiff: Kevin E. Browne
Defendant: William Bailiff, Jonathan Zadina, Robert Scott and Christopher Beas
Case Number: 2:2019cv02167
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, addressed to Kevin Browne. (tvn)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, by Plaintiff Kevin E. Browne. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tvn)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, by Plaintiff Kevin E. Browne. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tvn)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, by Plaintiff Kevin E. Browne. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tvn)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees (in forma pauperis) and entering ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby required to show good cause in writing to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree, on or before May 1, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/11/2019. Mailed to pro se party Kevin E. Browne by certified and regular mail. (Certified Tracking Number: 70162070000006868911). (ts)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Kevin E. Browne (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(tvn)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kevin E. Browne. (tvn)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Kevin E. Browne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(tvn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browne v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bailiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Zadina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Beas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin E. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?