Teegarden v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Plaintiff: Catherine Teegarden
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02181
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Catherine Teegarden. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. waiver sent on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Ruane, Sarah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - The following case shall be deemed included in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in accordance with the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A), as modified the Court's June 11, 2019 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines: Teegarden v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan.,Case No. 19-cv-2181-JAR-TJJ. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 06/20/2019. (ses)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Agreeing to Transfer by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Schult, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer B. Wieland on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Wieland, Jennifer)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas P. Schult on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Schult, Thomas)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that pursuant to Local Rule 23-A,the parties shall file any notice of related case, or a stipulation agreeing to transfer signed by all parties, no later than seven calendar days from the date of this Order, or by June 20, 2019. The parties only need file any notice of related case or stipulation in this individual action. (See Order for details.) Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/13/2019. (bw)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings. District Judge Carlos Murguia no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/7/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(hw)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all further proceedings. District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil, Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 5/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(as)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Catherine Teegarden re #3 Order, re: Motion to Consolidate (Ruane, Sarah)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Any party that wishes to be heard on the issue of consolidation is directed to file a response to this order on or before May 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 19-2118-DDC-JPO Motion to Consolidate) (ht)
April 9, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Catherine Teegarden. (Ruane, Sarah)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4770391.), filed by Catherine Teegarden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ruane, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teegarden v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Teegarden
Represented By: Sarah S. Ruane
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?