Jackson v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Plaintiff: Kamilah Lashay Jackson
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 2:2019cv02186
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Janay Podraza)(Taylor, Andrea)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Taylor, Andrea)
May 2, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #7 Return of Service of Summons Executed as to USA filed by Kamilah Lashay Jackson mailed to Kamilah Lashay Jackson on 5/2/2019 by regular mail. (ca)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Personal Service (USM-285) on 5/2/2019 Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Summons served on United States Attorney. (ca)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail (USM-285) on 4/26/2019 Summons served on United States Attorney General. (ca)
April 26, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #5 Return of Service of Summons Executed filed by Kamilah Lashay Jackson mailed to Kamilah Lashay Jackson on 4/26/2019 by regular mail. (ca)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (USM-285) by Kamilah Lashay Jackson upon Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 4/22/2019. Mailed to pro se party, Kamilah Lashay Jackson, by regular mail. (ca) Modified docket text due to incorrect event used on 4/29/2019(ca).
April 25, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document Summons Issued as to USA mailed to Kamilah Lashay Jackson on 4/25/2019 by regular mail. (ca)
April 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service USM 285) (ca)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summon(s) to the Clerk for service. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on April 16, 2019. Mailed to pro se party Kamilah Jackson by regular mail (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rs)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Kamilah Lashay Jackson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kamilah Lashay Jackson. (ca)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Kamilah Lashay Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Andrea L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamilah Lashay Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?