Spin Master Ltd. v. Odyssey Marketing Corp.
Plaintiff: Spin Master Ltd.
Defendant: Odyssey Marketing Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02193
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd. (Redmond, Megan)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff's response deadline is extended to 7/8/2019. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/21/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams)
June 21, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(aw)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd. (Redmond, Megan)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Odyssey Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1Exhibit A)(Klein, Jason)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer of Odyssey Marketing Corp due on or before 5/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/9/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Odyssey Marketing Corp. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Klein, Jason)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Odyssey Marketing Corp. . (Klein, Jason)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jason H. Klein on behalf of Odyssey Marketing Corp.. (Klein, Jason)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Spin Master Ltd. upon Odyssey Marketing Corp. served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019 (Redmond, Megan)
April 18, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Odyssey Marketing Corp. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
April 18, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spin Master Ltd. identifying Spin Master Limited as corporate parent . (Redmond, Megan)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Redmond, Megan)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4782258.), filed by Spin Master Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Request for Designation of Trial)(Redmond, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spin Master Ltd. v. Odyssey Marketing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odyssey Marketing Corp.
Represented By: Jason H. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spin Master Ltd.
Represented By: Megan J. Redmond
Represented By: Caroline Ann Bader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?