Askew v. Country Preferred Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Larry Askew, II
Defendant: Country Preferred Insurance Company and Country Financial Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02201
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/28/19. (aw)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Larry Askew II by Country Preferred Insurance Company (Bartalos, Molly)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time four days. Discovery deadline 11/29/2019. Dispositive motion deadline 1/10/2020. Mediation deadline 9/30/2019. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 8/16/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/10/2019. Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. See attached Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/19/19. (aw)
June 19, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants Rule 26 Disclosures by Country Preferred Insurance Company (Bartalos, Molly)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER withdrawing #6 Motion for Discovery. This document was docketed by counsel as a "motion," but the document is titled "Initial Disclosures of Plaintiff." The document is not a motion but is, in fact, Plaintiff's initial disclosures pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a). The Court is marking the "motion" as withdrawn for docketing purposes. This has no impact on Plaintiff's initial disclosures. The Court notes that Rule 26 initial disclosures are not to be filed with the Court. Rather, a notice that the disclosures have been served on opposing counsel is the appropriate filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/28/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 (WITHDRAWN PER 7 ORDER) MOTION for Discovery Rule 26 Disclosure by Plaintiff Larry Askew, II (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Gepford, Lawrence) Document blocked on 6/3/2019 from public view since Initial Disclosures are not be filed. (tvn).
May 13, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/13/2019. (tvn)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants on the conference. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/13/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/13/2019. (NOTE:As indicated in the Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling, copies of the parties' initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) must be attached to the parties' completed Rule 26(f) planning report. These disclosures will be discussed with the magistrate judge during the upcoming scheduling conference in finalizing a discovery and case plan that achieves the objectives of Rule 1.) See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/10/19. (aw) Corrected Rule 26(a) initial disclosures deadline on 5/13/2019 (tvn).
April 26, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Designation Place of Trial by Country Preferred Insurance Company (Bartalos, Molly)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR DAMAGES to Complaint by Country Preferred Insurance Company.(Bartalos, Molly)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Country Preferred Insurance Company. (Bartalos, Molly)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County Kansas, case number 2018-CV-000961 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4789729.), filed by Country Preferred Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bartalos, Molly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Askew v. Country Preferred Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian Michael Bartalos, I
Represented By: Molly Brown Bartalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Financial Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian Michael Bartalos, I
Represented By: Molly Brown Bartalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Askew, II
Represented By: Lawrence F. Gepford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?