Ward Kraft, Inc. et al v. UMB Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Ward Kraft, Inc. and Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Farris Bobango PLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: UMB Bank, N.A.
3Rd Party Defendant: Triumph Bank
Case Number: 2:2019cv02211
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(adc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Plaintiffs Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Ward Kraft, Inc. (Geary, Matthew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Farris Bobango PLC identifying Farris Bobango PLC as corporate parent . (Morrow, James)
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 07/09/2019 for Third Party Defendant Triumph Bank to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 06/25/2019. (ca)
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Daniel R. Luppino on behalf of Triumph Bank (Luppino, Daniel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant UMB Bank, N.A.'s Crossclaim by Defendant Farris Bobango PLC(Hyde, Hillary)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant UMB Bank, N.A.'s Crossclaim by Defendant Farris Bobango PLC (Hyde, Hillary)
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 Ward Kraft, Inc.'s ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim UMB BANK N.A.'S COUNTERCLAIM by Ward Kraft, Inc. (Geary, Matthew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendant Farris Bobango PLC(Hyde, Hillary)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendant Farris Bobango PLC (Hyde, Hillary)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by UMB Bank, N.A. upon Triumph Bank served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019 (Sobczyk, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UMB Bank, N.A. identifying None as corporate parent . (Sobczyk, Brian)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 06/12/2019 for Defendant Farris Bobango PLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 05/29/2019. (ca)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 (PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED INCORRECTLY - SEE DE #14 ) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Farris Bobango PLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Morrow, James) Modified on 5/29/2019 (hw).
May 29, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Triumph Bank. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Hillary Hyde on behalf of Farris Bobango PLC. (Hyde, Hillary)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Triumph Bank, filed by UMB Bank, N.A.(Sobczyk, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Farris Bobango PLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Ward Kraft, Inc. by UMB Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sobczyk, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 (PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED INCORRECTLY - SEE DE #14 ) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Farris Bobango PLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Morrow, James) Modified on 5/29/2019 (hw).
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by James Christian Morrow on behalf of Farris Bobango PLC. (Morrow, James)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ward Kraft, Inc., Twin City Fire Insurance Company upon Farris Bobango PLC served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Attachment- Return of Service)(Geary, Matthew)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Twin City Fire Insurance Company identifying The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Geary, Matthew)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ward Kraft, Inc. identifying W/K Holding Company, Inc. as corporate parent . (Geary, Matthew)
May 1, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Farris Bobango PLC, UMB Bank, N.A. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 1, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Ward Kraft, Inc. (Geary, Matthew)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Ward Kraft, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Geary, Matthew)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Ward Kraft, Inc. (Geary, Matthew)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4794720.), filed by Ward Kraft, Inc., Twin City Fire Insurance Company.(Geary, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward Kraft, Inc. et al v. UMB Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farris Bobango PLC
Represented By: Hillary Hyde
Represented By: James Christian Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: UMB Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brian E. Sobczyk
Represented By: Christopher Sevedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ward Kraft, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. Geary
Represented By: Carol Z. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew W. Geary
Represented By: Carol Z. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Triumph Bank
Represented By: Daniel R. Luppino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?