Kaw Drive, LLC v. Secura Insurance

Plaintiff: Kaw Drive, LLC
Defendant: Secura Insurance
Case Number: 2:2019cv02238
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY to Reset Deadlines/Hearings: At the request of counsel, the Scheduling Conference is RESET for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Report of Parties Planning Meeting and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 9/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 8/1/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 8/1/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/1/19. (aw)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Secura Insurance . (Crawford, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal service by Kaw Drive, LLC upon Secura Insurance served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019 (Robinson, Burke)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John M. Brigg on behalf of Secura Insurance (Brigg, John)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Secura Insurance.(Crawford, William)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Robert Dale Green as counsel for Kaw Drive, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/30/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Robert D. Green to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4822018.) by Plaintiff Kaw Drive, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Robinson, Burke)
May 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Secura Insurance. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kaw Drive, LLC. (Robinson, Burke)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4807973.), filed by Kaw Drive, LLC.(Robinson, Burke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaw Drive, LLC v. Secura Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secura Insurance
Represented By: John M. Brigg
Represented By: William Clayton Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaw Drive, LLC
Represented By: Burke D. Robinson
Represented By: Robert Dale Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?