Hollinger v. Christots Montessori School, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Veronica Hollinger
Defendant: Christots Montessori School, Inc., Linda Steck, Phillip Steck and Bethany Enyart
Case Number: 2:2019cv02243
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
2 Judge: Carlos Murguia
3 Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Veronica Hollinger(Ziegelmeyer, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Veronica Hollinger (Ziegelmeyer, John)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. For good cause shown, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(A), plaintiff shall have until July 18, 2019 to respond to defendants' counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 07/08/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Plaintiff Veronica Hollinger (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Ziegelmeyer, John) (Modified on 7/8/2019 to correct ecf event. (heo))
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 7/23/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/28/19. (ss)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Christots Montessori School, Inc. by Christots Montessori School, Inc..(Uvodich, Jean)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Bethany Enyart.(Uvodich, Jean)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Christots Montessori School, Inc. by Phillip Steck, Linda Steck.(Uvodich, Jean)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal service by Veronica Hollinger upon Bethany Enyart served on 5/26/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 (Ziegelmeyer, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal service by Veronica Hollinger upon Linda Steck served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019 (Ziegelmeyer, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal service by Veronica Hollinger upon Phillip Steck served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019 (Ziegelmeyer, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal service by Veronica Hollinger upon Christots Montessori School, Inc. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019 (Ziegelmeyer, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A redacted version of Exhibit A and Exhibit C re #1 Complaint has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C) (hw)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all further proceedings. District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 5/21/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
May 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christots Montessori School, Inc., Bethany Enyart, Linda Steck, Phillip Steck. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 20, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Veronica Hollinger. (Ziegelmeyer, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4811120.), filed by Veronica Hollinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Ziegelmeyer, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #6 Redacted Exhibit A, #7 Redacted Exhibit C) (hw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollinger v. Christots Montessori School, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Hollinger
Represented By: John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Represented By: Christopher J. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christots Montessori School, Inc.
Represented By: Jean Ann Uvodich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Steck
Represented By: Jean Ann Uvodich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Steck
Represented By: Jean Ann Uvodich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Enyart
Represented By: Jean Ann Uvodich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?