Bilhimer v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Joe Bilhimer
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Solera Holdings, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC and Audatex North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02248
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
2 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul T. Fox and #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexandra J. Block as counsel for Audatex North America, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC, and Solera Holdings, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/20/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Alexandra Block to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4842547.) by Defendants Audatex North America, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC, Solera Holdings, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice E-Filing Registration Form)(Denning, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Paul T. Fox to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4842534.) by Defendants Audatex North America, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC, Solera Holdings, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice E-Filing Registration Form)(Denning, William)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William P. Denning on behalf of Audatex North America, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC, Solera Holdings, Inc. (Denning, William)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond on or before 7/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/14/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Moseley, Jeremy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Joe Bilhimer upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 (Barton, Eric)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Solera Holdings, Inc. SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Joe Bilhimer upon Solera Holdings, Inc. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019 (Barton, Eric)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Explore Information Services, LLC SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Joe Bilhimer upon Explore Information Services, LLC served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019 (Barton, Eric)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Audatex North America, Inc. SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Joe Bilhimer upon Audatex North America, Inc. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019 (Barton, Eric)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bw)
May 21, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Audatex North America, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC, Solera Holdings, Inc., State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Joe Bilhimer. (Barton, Eric)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4812077.), filed by Joe Bilhimer.(Barton, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bilhimer v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeremy A. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solera Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Paul T. Fox
Represented By: Alexandra J. Block
Represented By: William P. Denning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Explore Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Paul T. Fox
Represented By: Alexandra J. Block
Represented By: William P. Denning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audatex North America, Inc.
Represented By: Paul T. Fox
Represented By: Alexandra J. Block
Represented By: William P. Denning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Bilhimer
Represented By: Sarah S. Ruane
Represented By: Eric D. Barton
Represented By: Tyler W. Hudson
Represented By: Thomas A. Rottinghaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?