Crestbrook Insurance Co. v Ancona
Plaintiff: Crestbrook Insurance Co.
Defendant: Michael L. Ancona
Case Number: 2:2019cv02249
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in KC Courtroom 236 before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/22/2019. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/28/2019. (ts)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael L. Ancona.(McGrevey, Sean)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Crestbrook Insurance Co. upon Michael L. Ancona served on 6/5/2010, answer due 6/26/2010 (Housley, Casey)
May 22, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael L. Ancona. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Crestbrook Insurance Co. dba Nationwide Private Client. (Housley, Casey)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Crestbrook Insurance Co. dba Nationwide Private Client - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Housley, Casey)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4812389.), filed by Crestbrook Insurance Co. dba Nationwide Private Client. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition)(Housley, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crestbrook Insurance Co. v Ancona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crestbrook Insurance Co.
Represented By: Jordon T. Stanley
Represented By: Casey O. Housley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Ancona
Represented By: Sean T. McGrevey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?