Gardner et al v. USD 273 Beloit et al
Plaintiff: Trevor Gardner and Stefanie Gardner
Defendant: USD 273 Beloit, Board of Education, USD 273 Beloit, Jeff Slate, DS Bus Lines, Inc., Keith Kresin and Bragg Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02253
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #15 Crossclaim by DS Bus Lines, Inc..(Johnson, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 1st Amended ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against USD 273 Beloit by Bragg Lines, Inc., Keith Kresin, Jeff Slate, DS Bus Lines, Inc..(Johnson, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 CROSSCLAIM against DS Bus Lines, Inc., filed by USD 273 Beloit, USD 273 Beloit, Board of Education.(Pigg, J.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by USD 273 Beloit, USD 273 Beloit, Board of Education.(Pigg, J.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bragg Lines, Inc., DS Bus Lines, Inc. (Johnson, Jennifer)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Bragg Lines, Inc., DS Bus Lines, Inc., Keith Kresin, Jeff Slate.(Johnson, Jennifer)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified mail by Stefanie Gardner, Trevor Gardner upon DS Bus Lines, Inc. served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019 (Zmijewski, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified mail by Stefanie Gardner, Trevor Gardner upon Keith Kresin served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019 (Zmijewski, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified mail by Stefanie Gardner, Trevor Gardner upon Bragg Lines, Inc. served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019 (Zmijewski, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified mail by Stefanie Gardner, Trevor Gardner upon Jeff Slate served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019 (Zmijewski, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified mail by Stefanie Gardner, Trevor Gardner upon USD 273 Beloit served on 6/5/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 (Zmijewski, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified mail by Stefanie Gardner, Trevor Gardner upon USD 273 Beloit, Board of Education served on 6/5/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 (Zmijewski, Daniel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 07/10/2019 for Defendants USD 273 Beloit, USD 273 Beloit, Board of Education to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 06/19/2019. (ca)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by J. Steven Pigg on behalf of USD 273 Beloit, USD 273 Beloit, Board of Education. (Pigg, J.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A redacted version of #1 Complaint has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (ca)
May 22, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bragg Lines, Inc., DS Bus Lines, Inc., Keith Kresin, Jeff Slate, USD 273 Beloit, USD 273 Beloit, Board of Education. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 22, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Document (Complaint) is not redacted properly. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 22, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Stefanie Gardner, Trevor Gardner. (Zmijewski, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4814503.), filed by Stefanie Gardner, Trevor Gardner.(Zmijewski, Daniel) Modified on 5/22/2019 (ca). Complaint blocked from public view due to violation of privacy policy. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2019: #1 Redacted Complaint) (ca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner et al v. USD 273 Beloit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 273 Beloit, Board of Education
Represented By: J. Steven Pigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 273 Beloit
Represented By: J. Steven Pigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Slate
Represented By: J. Philip Davidson
Represented By: Jennifer R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS Bus Lines, Inc.
Represented By: J. Philip Davidson
Represented By: Jennifer R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Kresin
Represented By: J. Philip Davidson
Represented By: Jennifer R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bragg Lines, Inc.
Represented By: J. Philip Davidson
Represented By: Jennifer R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Gardner
Represented By: Christopher S. Dove
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefanie Gardner
Represented By: Christopher S. Dove
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?