Akins v. ColdPoint Logistics
Plaintiff: Mertez Dean Akins
Defendant: ColdPoint Logistics
Case Number: 2:2019cv02270
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #11 Motion for Reconsideration re #10 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 8/1/2019. (ydm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Mertez Dean Akins re #10 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (ydm) Modified on 7/26/2019 to change event to Motion for reconsideration instead of response per chambers. (JPO). (ydm)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/17/2019. Mailed to pro se party Mertez Dean Akins by regular mail. (ydm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Declaration of Good Faith Efforts to Obtain Counsel by Plaintiff Mertez Dean Akins. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (ydm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ColdPoint Logistics identifying NorthPoint Development LLC as corporate parent . (Thomas, Henry)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ColdPoint Logistics.(Thomas, Henry)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN Mail (Certified Mail) received re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis addressed to Mertez Akins. Not Remailed (ydm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (USM 285) by Mertez Dean Akins upon ColdPoint Logistics served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Mailed to pro se party Mertez Dean Akins by regular mail(ca).
June 5, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document Summons Issued mailed to Mertez Dean Akins on 6/5/2019 by regular mail. (ca)
June 5, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ColdPoint Logistics. (issued to US Marshal for service USM 285) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 06/04/19. Mailed to pro se party by certified and regular mail. (jc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Mertez Dean Akins (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Mertez Dean Akins. (ca)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Mertez Dean Akins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Form)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akins v. ColdPoint Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mertez Dean Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ColdPoint Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?