Bone et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al *** REMINDER TO COUNSEL -- This case is a tag-a-long action to 19-md-2887, MDL 2887 In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation***

Plaintiff: Abraham Mejia, Bradley Mace, Christy Zisser, Brad Getz, Janine Buckley, Elisa Bindus, Christine Sawyer, Jill Lanham, Nancy McAtee, Sherri Anderson, Cheryl Barr, Julie Hoffman, Patrick McDonald, Kelly Bone, Ada Darnell, Sarah Stroud, Penny Hopson, Simmons Chhamboni and Scott Molski
Defendant: John Does 1 - 10, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company and Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02284
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00831. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 7, 2019 Case transferred to District of Kansas. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 21 Certified Copy of JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Kansas are transferred to the District of Kansas, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Julie A. Robinson for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A) (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 20 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Kansas are transferred to the District of Kansas, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Julie A. Robinson for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Stay all proceedings in light of the impending transfer decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation #19 is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 4/23/2019. (Ramesar, Thameera) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings in Light of Pending Transfer Decision by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Hannah Y. Chanoine in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Chanoine, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Chanoine, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Chanoine, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Chanoine, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Chanoine, #8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Chanoine) (Chanoine, Hannah Y) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Related Case indicated on the civil cover sheet in case number 19cv2225. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 4/5/2019. (Marino, Janine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint, by Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Chanoine, Hannah Y) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Related Case (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. Re #13 Amended Complaint, by Sherri Anderson, Cheryl Barr, Elisa Bindus, Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Simmons Chhamboni, Ada Darnell, Brad Getz, Julie Hoffman, Penny Hopson, Jill Lanham, Bradley Mace, Nancy McAtee, Patrick McDonald, Abraham Mejia, Scott Molski, Christine Sawyer, Sarah Stroud, Christy Zisser (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. Re #13 Amended Complaint, by Sherri Anderson, Cheryl Barr, Elisa Bindus, Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Simmons Chhamboni, Ada Darnell, Brad Getz, Julie Hoffman, Penny Hopson, Jill Lanham, Bradley Mace, Nancy McAtee, Patrick McDonald, Abraham Mejia, Scott Molski, Christine Sawyer, Sarah Stroud, Christy Zisser (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Christine Sawyer, Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Simmons Chhamboni, Cheryl Barr, Scott Molski, Elisa Bindus, Brad Getz, Sherri Anderson, Abraham Mejia, Nancy McAtee, Jill Lanham, Christy Zisser, Penny Hopson, Ada Darnell, Julie Hoffman, Patrick McDonald, Sarah Stroud, Bradley Mace. (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc. answer due 4/5/2019; Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. answer due 4/5/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/7/2019. (Marino, Janine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/6/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Consent Letter Motion Requesting a 30-day Extension of Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint) by Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Chanoine, Hannah Y) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Y Shay Chanoine on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Chanoine, Hannah Y) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer. Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc. served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 COPY of Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Originally filed before the JPMDL. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 HPN Sales summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11189611 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer. (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bone et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al *** REMINDER TO COUNSEL -- This case is a tag-a-long action to 19-md-2887, MDL 2887 In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Mejia
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Mace
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Zisser
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Getz
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Buckley
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Bindus
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Lanham
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy McAtee
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Anderson
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Barr
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Hoffman
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick McDonald
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Bone
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Darnell
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Stroud
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Hopson
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simmons Chhamboni
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Molski
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y Shay Chanoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: Hannah Y Shay Chanoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y Shay Chanoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?