Rector v. Meredith Corporation
Plaintiff: Jay Rector
Defendant: Meredith Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv02288
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
2 Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott W. Stemetzki for Meredith Corporation pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/10/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David E. Mills for Meredith Corporation pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/10/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Scott W. Stemetzki to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4858420.) by Defendant Meredith Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Rhodes, Bernard)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney David Mills to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4858412.) by Defendant Meredith Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Rhodes, Bernard)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/9/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(yh)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert Cahill for Meredith Corporation pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/8/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 consent motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by August 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 07/08/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Meredith Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Rhodes, Bernard)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Robert T. Cahill to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-4856797.) by Defendant Meredith Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Rhodes, Bernard)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jay Rector upon Meredith Corporation served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019 (Nehrbass, Scott)
June 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Meredith Corporation. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jay Rector. (Nehrbass, Scott)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4831528.), filed by Jay Rector.(Nehrbass, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rector v. Meredith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Rector
Represented By: Scott C. Nehrbass
Represented By: Alexandra N.C. Rose
Represented By: Boyd A. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Corporation
Represented By: Scott W. Stemetzki
Represented By: Bernard J. Rhodes
Represented By: Robert Cahill
Represented By: David E. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?