Crane v. Acendas LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sara Crane
Defendant: Acendas LLC and BCD Travel USA LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02292
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 9/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/2/19. (alm)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Acendas LLC, BCD Travel USA LLC.(Summers, Curtis)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 07/29/2019 for Defendants BCD Travel USA LLC, Acendas LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 07/15/2019. (ca)
June 13, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Acendas LLC, BCD Travel USA LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A redacted version of Exhibit B #1 Complaint has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (ca)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A redacted version of Exhibit A #1 Complaint has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (ca)
June 11, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Documents Exhibit A and Exhibit B are not redacted properly. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 11, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Sara Crane. (Galloway, Lewis)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4834167.), filed by Sara Crane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acendas Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - BCD Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit C - Acendas Notice of Right to Sue, #4 Exhibit D - BCD Notice of Right to Sue)(Galloway, Lewis) Modified on 6/11/2019 (ca). Exhibits A and B are blocked from public view due to violation of privacy policy. (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2019: #5 Redacted Exhibit A, #6 Redacted Exhibit B) (ca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crane v. Acendas LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Crane
Represented By: Lewis M. Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acendas LLC
Represented By: Dylan M. Long
Represented By: Curtis R. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCD Travel USA LLC
Represented By: Dylan M. Long
Represented By: Curtis R. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?