Drew v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Plaintiff: John F. Drew
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 2:2019cv02299
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail USM-285 on 7/9/2019. Summons served on United States Attorney General. (ca)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail USM-285 on 7/1/2019. Summons served on Office of the Regional Counsel. (ca)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Personal Service (USM 285) on 7/3/2019 Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, answer due 9/3/2019. Summons served on United States Attorney. (ca)
June 28, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (issued to US Marshal for service USM 285) (ca)
June 28, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: On June 17, 2019, Andrew M. Saul replaced Nancy A. Berryhill as the Commissioner of Social Security. The party text for the defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of has been updated to reflect this change. (ca)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff(s) or plaintiff(s) counsel directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summon(s) to the Clerk for service. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
June 13, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff F. Drew John. (Green, James)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff F. Drew John (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pauperis)(Green, James)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by F. Drew John.(Green, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drew v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. Drew
Represented By: James H. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?