Jubinville et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al *** REMINDER TO COUNSEL -- This case is a tag-a-long action to 19-md-2887, MDL 2887 In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation***

Plaintiff: Kelli Coppi, Laura Freeman, Jennifer Jubinville and Jenna Sprengel
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.
Petitioner: Kristina Johnson, Theresa Erickson and Cliff Palifrone
Case Number: 2:2019cv02303
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 30 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Rhode Island; Case Number 1:19-cv-00074. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 13, 2019 Filing 29 TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2887 Transferring this matter to the District of Kansas and assignment to the Honorable Julie A. Robinson for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. So Ordered by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(Jackson, Ryan) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: In light of the Court's Order directing the parties to stop sending letters regarding mediation based on the Court's intention not to issue orders, inter alia regarding the appointment of lead counsel and mediation, until the MDL has named the transferee district for the case, and because the motion to intervene is for the limited purpose of having a role in a court-ordered mediation prior to the MDL's determination, Motion to intervene (ECF No. 26) is denied. #26 Motion to Intervene. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/12/2019. (Noel, Jeannine) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
April 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #26 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to stop sending correspondence to the court regarding mediation. This court has no intention to issue any orders, except on currently pending motions, until the MDL has determined which district should handle this matter. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/12/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part #7 Motion for Protective Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/12/2019. (Saucier, Martha) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 27 Intervenor COMPLAINT against Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. as Intervenor Defendant, filed by Theresa Erickson, Kristina Johnson, Cliff Palifrone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Enright, Thomas) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs filed by Kristina Johnson, Cliff Palifrone, Theresa Erickson. Responses due by 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Enright, Thomas) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by Kelli Coppi, Laura Freeman, Jennifer Jubinville, Jenna Sprengel re #22 Notice (Other) Reply ISO Mediation Letter (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Mediation)(Greene, Vincent) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Kelli Coppi, Laura Freeman, Jennifer Jubinville, Jenna Sprengel Response to Morris Laing letter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Morris Laing letter)(Greene, Vincent) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. / Notice (Other) (Chanoine, Hannah) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 30, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Jennifer Jubinville re #21 Notice (Other) Corrected Notice for Mandatory Mediation Before a Private Mediator to be Selected by the Parties (Greene, Vincent) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Jennifer Jubinville for mandatory mediation before a private mediator to be selected by the parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Greene, Vincent) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #19 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/27/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Protective Order held on March 18, 2019, before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen Wischnowsky, Telephone number (401) 752-7045. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 4/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2019. (Wischnowsky, Karen) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 23, 2019 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Corrente, Robert) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #17 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Wischnowsky. (Dias, Jennifer) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/18/2019 before Judge Mag. J. Patricia A. Sullivan. Expedited Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered within 7 calendar days.. (Corrente, Robert) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2019 re #7 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Jenna Sprengel, Jennifer Jubinville, Laura Freeman, Kelli Coppi. Kenneth Wexler, Nyran Rasche and Dennis Costigan for plaintiffs; Hannah Chanoine and Robert Corrente for defendants. Court addresses both sides; Both sides argue; One Exhibit entered; Court takes matter under advisement. (Court Reporter FTR-Recording in Courtroom B at 9:54.) (Saucier, Martha) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Jennifer Jubinville, Laura Freeman, Kelli Coppi, Jenna Sprengel for Complaint and Summons All Defendants. (Fitzpatrick, Fidelma) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. Costigan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Costigan, Dennis) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. in opposition to #8 Notice (Other), Motion for Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Affidavit Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Affidavit Declaration, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C)(Corrente, Robert) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colgate-Palmolive Company for Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales Inc... (Corrente, Robert) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colgate-Palmolive Company for Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc... (Corrente, Robert) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Y. Chanoine, Richard Goetz ; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Y. Chanoine, Richard Goetz. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/11/2019. (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Richard B. Goetz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1333881 ) filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Corrente, Robert) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Hannah Y. Chanoine to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1333870 ) filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Corrente, Robert) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Clark Corrente on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Corrente, Robert) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 7, 2019 TEXT ORDER: Defendants to file opposition to motion by 5 pm on March 14, 2019. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Protective Order . Responses due by 3/14/2019. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Plaintiffs are directed to provide a copy of this text order to Defendants counsel. (Saucier, Martha) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Kelli Coppi, Laura Freeman, Jennifer Jubinville, Jenna Sprengel re #7 MOTION for Protective Order - Notice of Compliance with March 6, 2019 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kenneth A Wexler)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Before the Court will set an expedited briefing schedule and hearing on Plaintiffs' emergency motion for protective order ("motion") (ECF No. 7), Defendants must be served with the summons and complaint in this case. If Defendants have been served, as a further precondition to expedited treatment of the motion, Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the motion on Defendants, as well as on Defendants' counsel in connection with this case if known, and to file a notification that Defendants have actual notice of the pendency of the motion. As soon as the Court is advised that Defendants are served and have actual notice of the motion, an expedited briefing schedule and a date for a hearing will be set. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 3/6/2019. (Noel, Jeannine) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Protective Order referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Protective Order filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memo in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for a Protective Order, #2 Supplement Declaration of Kenneth Wexler in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Greene, Vincent) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bethany R. Turke ; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Umar Sattar ; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth A. Wexler. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/22/2019. (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Kenneth A. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice for All Plaintiffs ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1327582 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fitzpatrick, Fidelma) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Umar Sattar to Appear Pro Hac Vice for All Plaintiffs ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1327581 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fitzpatrick, Fidelma) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Bethany R. Turke to Appear Pro Hac Vice for All Plaintiffs ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1327579 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fitzpatrick, Fidelma) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1325422 ), filed by Jennifer Jubinville, Laura Freeman, Kelli Coppi, Jenna Sprengel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jubinville et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al *** REMINDER TO COUNSEL -- This case is a tag-a-long action to 19-md-2887, MDL 2887 In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Coppi
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Vincent L. Greene, IV
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Bethany R. Turke
Represented By: Dennis A. Costigan
Represented By: Umar Sattar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Freeman
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Vincent L. Greene, IV
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Bethany R. Turke
Represented By: Dennis A. Costigan
Represented By: Umar Sattar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jubinville
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Vincent L. Greene, IV
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Bethany R. Turke
Represented By: Dennis A. Costigan
Represented By: Umar Sattar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Sprengel
Represented By: Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Vincent L. Greene, IV
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Bethany R. Turke
Represented By: Dennis A. Costigan
Represented By: Umar Sattar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kristina Johnson
Represented By: Thomas J Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Theresa Erickson
Represented By: Thomas J Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cliff Palifrone
Represented By: Thomas J Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Goetz
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Goetz
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?