Niemann v Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Niemann
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company and Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02308
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Patricia Niemann (Hammond, Thomas)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Patricia Niemann upon Colgate-Palmolive Company served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 (Hammond, Thomas)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Patricia Niemann upon Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 (Hammond, Thomas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - The following cases shall be deemed included in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in accordance with the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A), as modified the Court's June 11, 2019 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines: Brown v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2110-JAR-TJJ; Niemann v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Colgate-Palmolive Company, D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2308-JAR-TJJ; Hess v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2171-JAR-TJJ; and Rider, et al. v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2206-JAR-TJJ. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 06/20/2019. (ses)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Agreeing to Transfer by Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Schult, Thomas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer B. Wieland on behalf of Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Wieland, Jennifer)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas P. Schult on behalf of Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Schult, Thomas)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that pursuant to Local Rule 23-A,the parties shall file any notice of related case, or a stipulation agreeing to transfer signed by all parties, no later than seven calendar days from the date of this Order, or by June 24, 2019. The parties only need file any notice of related case or stipulation in this individual action. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/17/2019. (bw)
June 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Patricia Niemann - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hammond, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Patricia Niemann. (Hammond, Thomas)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4837153.), filed by Patricia Niemann.(Hammond, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niemann v Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Niemann
Represented By: Thomas E. Hammond, II
Represented By: Lawrence C. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?