Sun-Dampier v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. *** REMINDER TO COUNSEL -- This case is a tag-a-long action to 19-md-2887, MDL 2887 In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation***
Plaintiff: Jun Virginia Sun-Dampier
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Petitioner: John Navarrete
Case Number: 2:2019cv02310
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 31 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 30 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00819. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 14, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to District of Kansas (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CMC: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 6/6/2019 11:00 AM is rescheduled to 6/20/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Tamburelli, Adam) (Filed on 5/20/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 26 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO (1) CONSOLIDATE AND APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL; (2) EXPEDITE DISCOVERY; AND (3) STAY by Judge Alsup denying #10 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying #20 Motion to Stay. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing re (15 in 3:19-cv-00767-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases, (26 in 3:19-cv-00767-WHA) MOTION to Expedite, (34 in 3:19-cv-00767-WHA) MOTION to Stay, (10 in 3:19-cv-00819-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases, (20 in 3:19-cv-00819-WHA) MOTION to Stay, (13 in 3:19-cv-00908-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases, (27 in 3:19-cv-00908-WHA) MOTION to Stay held on 4/25/2019. Parties are directed to submit the agreed protocol for product testing by 4/29/2019 at Noon. Plaintiffs should also be prepared to turn over all product evidence to FDA and Defendant. Court to issue written order. (Total Time in Court: 41 minutes.) Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Schubert, Kathryn Schubert; Adam Tamburelli. Defendant Attorney: Hannah Chanoine. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY (re #20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Except for Mediation Related Submissions, or in the Alternative, to Vacate CMC; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) / Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Further Support filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 4/22/2019) Modified on 4/23/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #21 STIPULATED REQUEST TO SHORTEN TIME FOR BRIEFING AND ADVANCING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY by Judge William Alsup. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER / Shortening Time for Briefing and Advancing Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Stay the Proceedings filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and John Navarrete. (Laurendeau, Amy) (Filed on 4/11/2019) Modified on 4/12/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Except for Mediation Related Submissions, or in the Alternative, to Vacate CMC; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 4/25/2019. Replies due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hannah Y. Chanoine in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 4/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byJohn Navarrete. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schubert, Robert) (Filed on 3/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARINGS: Motion Hearing re (15 in 3:19-cv-00767-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases, (10 in 3:19-cv-00819-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases, (13 in 3:19-cv-00908-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases previously set for 4/11/2019 8:00 AM is rescheduled to 4/25/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Motion Hearing re (26 in 3:19-cv-00767-WHA) MOTION to Expedite set for 4/25/2019 8:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, (Joint Stipulation For Extension Of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant To L.R. 6.1(a)) filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Jun Virginia Sun-Dampier. (Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 3/27/2019) Modified on 3/27/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Hannah Y. Chanoine. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byJun Virginia Sun-Dampier. (Tamburelli, Adam) (Filed on 3/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byHill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Laurendeau, Amy) (Filed on 3/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13189691.) filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 3/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colgate-Palmolive Company for Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Laurendeau, Amy) (Filed on 3/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jean Laurendeau for Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Laurendeau, Amy) (Filed on 3/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by John Navarrete. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 3/21/2019. Replies due by 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert C. Schubert in Support of Motion to Consolidate and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Consolidate and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schubert, Robert) (Filed on 3/7/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/26/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/25/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/15/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/1/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Tamburelli, Adam) (Filed on 2/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. Violation of the California Consumer Legal Remedies Act; 2. Violation of the California False Advertising Law; 3. Breach of Express Warranty ; 4. Breach of Implied Warranty of Merchantability; 5. Negligent Misrepresentation; 6. Negligence; 7. Violation of the California Unfair Competition Law; and 8. Unjust Enrichment; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13095157.). Filed byJun Virginia Sun-Dampier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tamburelli, Adam) (Filed on 2/14/2019) Modified on 2/19/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun-Dampier v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. *** REMINDER TO COUNSEL -- This case is a tag-a-long action to 19-md-2887, MDL 2887 In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Represented By: Amy J. Laurendeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jun Virginia Sun-Dampier
Represented By: Adam Tamburelli
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Navarrete
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?