Navarrete v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. *** REMINDER TO COUNSEL -- This case is a tag-a-long action to 19-md-2887, MDL 2887 In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation***
Plaintiff: Chad Wheeler, Diane Tyson, Thomas Gorham, Nancy Lerner, Sharon Jespersen, Aaron Sizemore, Melody Feld, Linda Foster, Sylvia Barton, Linda Cole, Patricia Schmits-Weagly, Michael Yesenko, John Navarrete, Keith Heck, Jamie Turner, Harriet Manoli, Leone Markham, Cara Kaufmann, Donna Folbaum, Mistie Loggins, Kelley O'Neill, Lisa Kannair, Tesha Ellis, Janet Schaefer and Susan Tarrence
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02312
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 58 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 57 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00767. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 14, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to District of Kansas (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING #54 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William Alsup. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER / Joint Stipulation regarding Continuance of June 6, 2019 Initial Case Management Conference and [Proposed] Order filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Plaintiffs and the Putative Class. (Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 6/3/2019) Modified on 6/3/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 53 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sylvia Barton, Linda Cole, Tesha Ellis, Melody Feld, Donna Folbaum, Linda Foster, Thomas Gorham, Keith Heck, Sharon Jespersen, Lisa Kannair, Cara Kaufmann, Nancy Lerner, Mistie Loggins, Harriet Manoli, Leone Markham, John Navarrete, Kelley O'Neill, Janet Schaefer, Patricia Schmits-Weagly, Aaron Sizemore, Susan Tarrence, Jamie Turner, Diane Tyson, Chad Wheeler, Michael Yesenko and Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc . (Schubert, Kathryn) (Filed on 5/30/2019) Modified on 5/31/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 52 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 5/30/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 51 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Schubert, Kathryn) (Filed on 5/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sylvia Barton, Linda Cole, Tesha Ellis, Melody Feld, Donna Folbaum, Linda Foster, Thomas Gorham, Keith Heck, Sharon Jespersen, Lisa Kannair, Cara Kaufmann, Nancy Lerner, Mistie Loggins, Harriet Manoli, Leone Markham, John Navarrete, Kelley O'Neill, Janet Schaefer, Patricia Schmits-Weagly, Aaron Sizemore, Susan Tarrence, Jamie Turner, Diane Tyson, Chad Wheeler, Michael Yesenko (Schubert, Kathryn) (Filed on 5/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 49 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 48 STIPULATION re #25 Amended Complaint,, / Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint pursuant to L.R. 6.1(a) filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., John Navarrete, Susan Tarrence, Janet Schaefer, Kelley Oneill, Cara Kaufman, Tesha Ellis, Nancy Lerner, Lisa Kannair, Michael Yesenko, Chad Wheeler, Harriet Manoli, Donna Folbaum, Keith Heck, Mistie Loggins, Thomas Gorham, Linda Cole, Diane Tyson, Aaron Sizemore, Jamie Turner, Leone Markham, Sharon Jespersen, Sylvia Barton, Linda Foster, Melody Feld and Patricia Schmits-Weagly. (Laurendeau, Amy) (Filed on 5/9/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 47 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-25-2019, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Ana M. Dub, CSR 7445, telephone number 415-290-1651; email: ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #43 Transcript Order,, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2019. (Related documents(s) #43 ) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO (1) CONSOLIDATE AND APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL; (2) EXPEDITE DISCOVERY; AND (3) STAY by Judge Alsup denying #26 Motion to Expedite; denying #34 Motion to Stay; denying #15 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 45 STIPULATION filed by Sylvia Barton, Linda Cole, Tesha Ellis, Melody Feld, Donna Folbaum, Linda Foster, Thomas Gorham, Keith Heck, Sharon Jespersen, Lisa Kannair, Cara Kaufmann, Nancy Lerner, Mistie Loggins, Harriet Manoli, Leone Markham, John Navarrete, Kelley O'Neill, Janet Schaefer, Patricia Schmits-Weagly, Aaron Sizemore, Susan Tarrence, Jamie Turner, Diane Tyson, Chad Wheeler, Michael Yesenko and Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Schubert, Robert) (Filed on 4/29/2019) Modified on 4/29/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/25/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 4/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/25/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Sylvia Barton, Linda Cole, Tesha Ellis, Melody Feld, Donna Folbaum, Linda Foster, Thomas Gorham, Keith Heck, Sharon Jespersen, Lisa Kannair, Cara Kaufmann, Nancy Lerner, Mistie Loggins, Harriet Manoli, Leone Markham, John Navarrete, Kelley O'Neill, Janet Schaefer, Patricia Schmits-Weagly, Aaron Sizemore, Susan Tarrence, Jamie Turner, Diane Tyson, Chad Wheeler, Michael Yesenko, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Schubert, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing re (15 in 3:19-cv-00767-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases, (26 in 3:19-cv-00767-WHA) MOTION to Expedite, (34 in 3:19-cv-00767-WHA) MOTION to Stay, (10 in 3:19-cv-00819-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases, (20 in 3:19-cv-00819-WHA) MOTION to Stay, (13 in 3:19-cv-00908-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases, (27 in 3:19-cv-00908-WHA) MOTION to Stay held on 4/25/2019. Parties are directed to submit the agreed protocol for product testing by 4/29/2019 at Noon. Plaintiffs should also be prepared to turn over all product evidence to FDA and Defendant. Court to issue written order. (Total Time in Court: 41 minutes.) Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Schubert, Kathryn Schubert; Adam Tamburelli. Defendant Attorney: Hannah Chanoine. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY (re #34 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Except for Mediation Related Submissions, or in the Alternative, to Vacate CMC; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) / Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Further Support filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 4/22/2019) Modified on 4/23/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 40 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #34 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Except for Mediation Related Submissions, or in the Alternative, to Vacate CMC; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed bySylvia Barton, Linda Cole, Tesha Ellis, Melody Feld, Donna Folbaum, Linda Foster, Thomas Gorham, Keith Heck, Sharon Jespersen, Lisa Kannair, Cara Kaufmann, Nancy Lerner, Mistie Loggins, Harriet Manoli, Leone Markham, John Navarrete, Kelley O'Neill, Janet Schaefer, Patricia Schmits-Weagly, Aaron Sizemore, Susan Tarrence, Jamie Turner, Diane Tyson, Chad Wheeler, Michael Yesenko. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dustin L. Schubert in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings Except for Mediation Related Submissions or in the Alternative to Vacate CMC)(Schubert, Robert) (Filed on 4/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gerard A. Savaresse. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13274905.) filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Laurendeau, Amy) (Filed on 4/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #35 STIPULATED REQUEST TO SHORTEN TIME FOR BRIEFING AND ADVANCING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY by Judge William Alsup granting. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY (re #26 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery ) filed bySylvia Barton, Linda Cole, Tesha Ellis, Melody Feld, Donna Folbaum, Linda Foster, Thomas Gorham, Keith Heck, Sharon Jespersen, Lisa Kannair, Cara Kaufmann, Nancy Lerner, Mistie Loggins, Harriet Manoli, Leone Markham, John Navarrete, Kelley O'Neill, Janet Schaefer, Patricia Schmits-Weagly, Aaron Sizemore, Susan Tarrence, Jamie Turner, Diane Tyson, Chad Wheeler, Michael Yesenko. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dustin L. Schubert)(Schubert, Robert) (Filed on 4/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER / Shortening Time for Briefing and Advancing Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Stay the Proceedings filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and John Navarrete. (Laurendeau, Amy) (Filed on 4/11/2019) Modified on 4/12/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Except for Mediation Related Submissions, or in the Alternative, to Vacate CMC; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 4/25/2019. Replies due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hannah Y. Chanoine in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 4/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION / Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to L.R. 6.1(a) filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., JOHN NAVARRETE, SUSAN TARRENCE, JANET SCHAEFER, KELLEY ONEILL, CARA KAUFMAN, TESHA ELLIS, NANCY LERNER, LISA KANNAIR, MICHAEL YESENKO, CHAD WHEELER, HARRIET MANOLI, DONNA FOLBAUM, KEITH HECK, MISTIE LOGGINS, THOMAS GORHAM, LINDA COLE, DIANE TYSON, AARON SIZEMORE, JAMIE TURNER, LEONE MARKHAM, SHARON JESPERSEN, SYLVIA BARTON, LINDA FOSTER, MELODY FELD, PATRICIA SCHMITS-WEAGLY. (Laurendeau, Amy) (Filed on 4/10/2019) Modified on 4/11/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 32 Request for Judicial Notice re #31 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byHill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #31 ) (Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 4/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 31 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #26 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery ) / Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Expedite Discovery filed byHill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ed Oblon in Support, #2 Declaration of Hannah Y. Chanoine in Support)(Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 4/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING #27 STIPULATED REQUEST TO ADVANCE HEARING by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Motion to Consolidate and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed bySylvia Barton, Linda Cole, Tesha Ellis, Melody Feld, Donna Folbaum, Linda Foster, Thomas Gorham, Keith Heck, Sharon Jespersen, Lisa Kannair, Cara Kaufmann, Nancy Lerner, Mistie Loggins, Harriet Manoli, Leone Markham, John Navarrete, Kelley O'Neill, Janet Schaefer, Patricia Schmits-Weagly, Aaron Sizemore, Susan Tarrence, Jamie Turner, Diane Tyson, Chad Wheeler, Michael Yesenko. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schubert, Robert) (Filed on 3/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARINGS: Motion Hearing re (15 in 3:19-cv-00767-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases, (10 in 3:19-cv-00819-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases, (13 in 3:19-cv-00908-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases previously set for 4/11/2019 8:00 AM is rescheduled to 4/25/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Motion Hearing re (26 in 3:19-cv-00767-WHA) MOTION to Expedite set for 4/25/2019 8:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #26 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery Request for Order Shortening Time for Briefing and Advancing Hearing filed by Sylvia Barton, Linda Cole, Tesha Ellis, Melody Feld, Donna Folbaum, Linda Foster, Thomas Gorham, Keith Heck, Sharon Jespersen, Lisa Kannair, Cara Kaufmann, Nancy Lerner, Mistie Loggins, Harriet Manoli, Leone Markham, John Navarrete, Kelley O'Neill, Janet Schaefer, Patricia Schmits-Weagly, Aaron Sizemore, Susan Tarrence, Jamie Turner, Diane Tyson, Chad Wheeler, Michael Yesenko and Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc . (Schubert, Dustin) (Filed on 3/26/2019) Modified on 3/26/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery filed by Sylvia Barton, Linda Cole, Tesha Ellis, Melody Feld, Donna Folbaum, Linda Foster, Thomas Gorham, Keith Heck, Sharon Jespersen, Lisa Kannair, Cara Kaufmann, Nancy Lerner, Mistie Loggins, Harriet Manoli, Leone Markham, John Navarrete, Kelley O'Neill, Janet Schaefer, Patricia Schmits-Weagly, Aaron Sizemore, Susan Tarrence, Jamie Turner, Diane Tyson, Chad Wheeler, Michael Yesenko. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dustin L. Schubert, #2 Declaration of Michael Yesenko, #3 Declaration of Harriet Manoli, #4 Declaration of Linda Foster, #5 Declaration of Patricia Schmits-Weagly, #6 Proposed Order)(Schubert, Robert) (Filed on 3/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. Filed by John Navarrete, Diane Tyson, Leone Markham, Mistie Loggins, Melody Feld, Kelley O'Neill, Thomas Gorham, Michael Yesenko, Jamie Turner, Aaron Sizemore, Cara Kaufmann, Donna Folbaum, Patricia Schmits-Weagly, Tesha Ellis, Harriet Manoli, Chad Wheeler, Linda Foster, Susan Tarrence, Sharon Jespersen, Keith Heck, Lisa Kannair, Sylvia Barton, Janet Schaefer, Nancy Lerner, Linda Cole. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dustin L. Schubert)(Schubert, Dustin) (Filed on 3/21/2019) Modified on 3/22/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Motion to Consolidate and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byHill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Laurendeau, Amy) (Filed on 3/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Hannah Y. Chanoine. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13162310.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/11/2019 filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 3/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Hannah Y. Chanoine. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Joint Stipulation For Extension Of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant To L.R. 6.1(a)) filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and John Navarrete. (Laurendeau, Amy) (Filed on 3/12/2019) Modified on 3/12/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13162310.) filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Chanoine, Hannah) (Filed on 3/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colgate-Palmolive Company for Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Laurendeau, Amy) (Filed on 3/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jean Laurendeau on behalf of Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Laurendeau, Amy) (Filed on 3/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #14 Motion to Relate Case. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Motion to Consolidate and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by John Navarrete. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 3/21/2019. Replies due by 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert C. Schubert in Support of Motion to Consolidate and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Consolidate and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schubert, Robert) (Filed on 3/7/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Relate Case filed by John Navarrete. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dustin L. Schubert in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schubert, Dustin) (Filed on 3/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Navarrete (Schubert, Kathryn) (Filed on 2/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/25/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #9 Motion to Relate Case. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Relate Case filed by John Navarrete. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryn Schubert in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related)(Schubert, Kathryn) (Filed on 2/20/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)[Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Navarrete.. (Schubert, Kathryn) (Filed on 2/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/27/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Schubert, Kathryn) (Filed on 2/12/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13087292.). Filed byJohn Navarrete. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schubert, Kathryn) (Filed on 2/12/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarrete v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. *** REMINDER TO COUNSEL -- This case is a tag-a-long action to 19-md-2887, MDL 2887 In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Wheeler
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Tyson
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gorham
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lerner
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Jespersen
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Sizemore
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Feld
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Foster
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Barton
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Cole
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Schmits-Weagly
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Yesenko
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Navarrete
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Willem F. Jonckheer
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Heck
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Turner
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet Manoli
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leone Markham
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara Kaufmann
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Folbaum
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mistie Loggins
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley O'Neill
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Kannair
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesha Ellis
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Schaefer
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Tarrence
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette Schubert
Represented By: Dustin Lamm Schubert
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Gerard A. Savaresse
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Represented By: Amy J. Laurendeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?