Lavalle v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Lavalle
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company and Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02313
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Lisa Lavalle (Sarnelli, Jennifer)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-02971. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 14, 2019 Case transferred to District of Kansas. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CT0-1 - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Liti"ation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of Kansas for the reasons stated in the order of June 4, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Julie A. Robinson. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis for all further proceedings. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 5/23/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Colgate-Palmolive Company. (McMahon, Carol) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (McMahon, Carol) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Related Case Pursuant to Local Rule 1.6 (Notis, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2019: #1 Additional Quality Control Form) (McMahon, Carol). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information., by Lisa Lavalle (Notis, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filled out correctly - specifically on page 2 the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2)section of the document. Question 1 indicates YES, however, this is not a removal from NYS Court located in Suffolk or Nassau County. Counsel is directed to correct Civil Cover Sheet and resubmit. Please answer all questions. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Sarnelli on behalf of Lisa Lavalle (aty to be noticed) (Sarnelli, Jennifer) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Lisa Lavalle (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) (Notis, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11496216 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Lisa Lavalle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Notis, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavalle v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lavalle
Represented By: Jennifer Sarnelli
Represented By: James S. Notis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?