Infante v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harold Infante
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Colgate-Palmolive Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02323
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ivy T Ngo on behalf of Harold Infante (Ngo, Ivy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:19-cv-01502. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 19-cv-01501 KMT, to to the Distric of Kansas, to become part of MDL 2887 by Clerk on 6/14/2019. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 6/17/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harold Infante. Colgate-Palmolive Company served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Moyer, Joshua) [Transferred from Colorado on 6/17/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harold Infante. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Moyer, Joshua) [Transferred from Colorado on 6/17/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/12/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/5/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/29/2019. (ksena) [Transferred from Colorado on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 6/17/2019.]
May 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colgate-Palmolive Company re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Harold Infante. (Moyer, Joshua) [Transferred from Colorado on 6/17/2019.]
May 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Harold Infante. (Moyer, Joshua) [Transferred from Colorado on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6707043)Attorney Joshua Elijah Moyer added to party Harold Infante(pty:pla), filed by Harold Infante. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moyer, Joshua) [Transferred from Colorado on 6/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infante v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Infante
Represented By: Joshua Elijah Moyer
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?