Donna Connary v. Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donna Connary
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company and Hills Pet Nutrition Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02327
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. See #20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Notice of Voluntary Dismissal also filed in MDL 2887, document 30. (gw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Donna Connary Third Amended (Blakeman, Benjamin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 5:19-cv-00913. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 17 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2887, transferring case to USDC, District of Kansas and assigned to Honorable Julie A Robinson. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. upon Colgate-Palmolive Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Hannah Chanoine. (Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. upon Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Hannah Chanoine. (Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-04248 PSG(SKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani and Judge John A. Kronstadt to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00913 PSG(SKx). Signed by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. See order for details. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. Related Case(s): 5:19-cv-00935; 2:19-cv-04248 (Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Other Filings - select - Notices - select - Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. Other error(s) with document(s): The document is accepted as filed. Counsel shall take notice of the CM/ECF procedures. Any future document will be stricken for failure to follow the procedures. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. (Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. (Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23750790 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. (Attorney Benjamin Blakeman added to party Donna Connary(pty:pla))(Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donna Connary v. Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hills Pet Nutrition Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Connary
Represented By: Benjamin Blakeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?