Georgeanne Hall v. Hills Pet Nutrition Inc et al
Plaintiff: Georgeanne Hall
Defendant: Hills Pet Nutrition Inc. and Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02329
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 57 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Darnell R. Donahue on behalf of Georgeanne Hall (Donahue, Darnell)
June 19, 2019 Filing 56 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 55 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-01423. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 54 Conditional Transfer Order - (CTO-1) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2887, transferring case to USDC, District of Kansas and assigned to Honorable Robinson. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO VACATE ALL DEADLINES PENDING THE JPMLS DECISION #41 **note changes made by Court to this document** (sr) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 52 Text Entry Order STRIKING Order on Motion to Stay Case, #51 due to clerical error. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 [stricken due to clerical error] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO VACATE ALL DEADLINES PENDING THE JPML'S DECISION #41 by Judge John F. Walter. The Application is GRANTED. The above-captioned action is hereby stayed until after the JPML decides the MDL Motion. The Scheduling Conference set for May 13, 2019 is VACATED, as are all other deadlines. (iv) Modified on 5/8/2019 (sr). [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Hannah Y. Chanoine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc, designating Richard B. Goetz as local counsel #48 . (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 49 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10, filed by Defendants Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc... (Goetz, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 48 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hannah Y. Chanoine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23634569) filed by Defendants Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goetz, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Richard B. Goetz Lead Trial Counsel re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendants Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Goetz, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Richard Blair Goetz on behalf of Defendants Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Attorney Richard Blair Goetz added to party Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Blair Goetz added to party Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc.(pty:dft))(Goetz, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING TO RESCHEDULE STATUS CONFERENCE #44 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. The Court will set dates based on the joint report no appearance by counsel will be necessary. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 44 STIPULATION to Reschedule Status Conference filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending the JPML'S Decision (Unopposed) #41 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Statement of Decision)(Chanoine, Hannah) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending the JPML'S Decision (Unopposed) #41 filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (McKany, Steven) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 41 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending the JPML'S Decision (Unopposed) filed by Defendants Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration of Hannah Y. Chanoine in Support, #3 Proposed Order) (Laurendeau, Amy) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc. identifying Colgate-Palmolive Company as Corporate Parent. (Laurendeau, Amy) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. identifying Colgate-Palmolive Company as Corporate Parent. (Laurendeau, Amy) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 38 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc., identifying Georgeanne Hall, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., and Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.. (Laurendeau, Amy) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy J Laurendeau on behalf of Defendants Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Attorney Amy J Laurendeau added to party Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy J Laurendeau added to party Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc.(pty:dft))(Laurendeau, Amy) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall, upon Defendant Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc. served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019; Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McClaren, Managing Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Rebecca A. Peterson of Lead Trial Counsel Re Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for May 13, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before May 3, 2019. The title page of the Joint Report must state the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. See document for details. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DECLINING TO APPROVE JOINT STIPULATION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND VACATE LOCAL RULE 23-3 DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION (filed 3/20/19; Docket No. #27 ) by Judge John F. Walter. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court DECLINES to approve the Stipulation. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Charles J. LaDuca to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall, designating Conrad B. Stephens as local counsel #26 . (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph DePalma to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall, designating Conrad B. Stephens as local counsel #24 . (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Susana Cruz Hodge to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall, designating Conrad B. Stephens as local counsel #25 . (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine W. Van Dyck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall, designating Conrad B. Stephens as local counsel #23 . (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Robert K. Shelquist to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall, designating Conrad B. Stephens as local counsel #14 . (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Respond to Complaint and Filing Class Certification Motion filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 26 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles J. LaDuca to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 3/8/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23344874) filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stephens, Conrad) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 25 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Susana Cruz Hodge to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 3/6/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23329957) filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stephens, Conrad) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 24 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph J. DePalma to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 3/6/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23330286) filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stephens, Conrad) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 23 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine W. Van Dyck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 3/6/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23329811) filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stephens, Conrad) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 22 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine W. Van Dyck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 3/6/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23329811) filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stephens, Conrad) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles J. LaDuca to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23344874) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Failed to use proper font size. See L.R. 11. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph J. DePalma to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23330286) #17 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine W. Van Dyck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23329811) #15 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Susana Cruz Hodge to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23329957) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Failed to use proper font size. See L.R. 11. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles J. LaDuca to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23344874) filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stephens, Conrad) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph J. DePalma to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23330286) filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stephens, Conrad) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Susana Cruz Hodge to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23329957) filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stephens, Conrad) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine W. Van Dyck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23329811) filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stephens, Conrad) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert K. Shelquist to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23312741) filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stephens, Conrad) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall, (Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Susana Cruz Hodge. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph J Depalma. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Katherine Van Dyck. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Charles J LaDuca. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert K Shelquist. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23277657 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attorney Rebecca Anne Peterson added to party Georgeanne Hall(pty:pla))(Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgeanne Hall v. Hills Pet Nutrition Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hills Pet Nutrition Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Goetz
Represented By: Amy J. Laurendeau
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Goetz
Represented By: Amy J. Laurendeau
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgeanne Hall
Represented By: Joseph J. DePalma
Represented By: Susana Cruz Hodge
Represented By: Rebecca A. Peterson
Represented By: Conrad B. Stephens
Represented By: Kevin A. Seely
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: Katherine W. Van Dyck
Represented By: Steven M. McKany
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Darnell R. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?