Skoog et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. *** REMINDER TO COUNSEL -- This case is a tag-a-long action to 19-md-2887, MDL 2887 In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation***
Plaintiff: Barbara Wertman, Michelle Black, Candice Howarth-Gadomski, Lee Skoog and Tiffany Miller
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02331
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01421. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 19, 2019 Original record transferred to the District of Kansas via interdistrict transfer system. (md) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/19/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order, Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MultidistrictLitigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to theDistrict of Kansas for the reasons stated in the order of June 4, 2019, and, with the consent of thatcourt, assigned to the Honorable Julie A. Robinson. (sg, ) (FILED IN ERROR; DUPLICATE ENTRY) Modified on 6/19/2019 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/19/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MultidistrictLitigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of Kansas for the reasons stated in the order of June 4, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Julie A. Robinson. (jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/19/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION TO STAY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/12/19. 6/13/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/19/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay (Unopposed) filed by HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC..Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(DWYER, MARY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/19/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF HANNAH Y. CHANOINE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/25/19. 4/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO CHANOINE AND E-MAILED. *ECF NOTIFICATION/REGISTRATION PACKET SENT TO CHANOINE ON 4/25/19*(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/19/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Hannah Y. Chanoine ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13501135.) filed by HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC..Certificate of Service.(DWYER, MARY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/19/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Colgate-Palmolive Company with Certificate of Service by HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC..(DWYER, MARY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/19/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY PATRICIA DWYER on behalf of HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC. with Certificate of Service(DWYER, MARY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/19/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LEE SKOOG, MICHELLE BLACK, BARBARA WERTMAN, CANDICE HOWARTH-GADOMSKI, TIFFANY MILLER. HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC. waiver sent on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (SCHAFFER, CHARLES) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/19/2019.]
April 3, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MICHELLE BLACK, CANDICE HOWARTH-GADOMSKI, TIFFANY MILLER, LEE SKOOG, BARBARA WERTMAN. (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/19/2019.]
April 3, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC. forwarded to Plaintiffs' Counsel on 4/3/19. (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/19/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE195145 filed by LEE SKOOG, MICHELLE BLACK, BARBARA WERTMAN, CANDICE HOWARTH-GADOMSKI, TIFFANY MILLER., JURY TRIAL DEMAND.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skoog et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. *** REMINDER TO COUNSEL -- This case is a tag-a-long action to 19-md-2887, MDL 2887 In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Represented By: Mary Patricia Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Wertman
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Black
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Howarth-Gadomski
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Skoog
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Miller
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?