Barber v. Capital Electric Construction Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Barber
Defendant: Capital Electric Construction Company, Inc., MDU Construction Services Group, Inc. and MDU Resources Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02334
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MDU Resources Group, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Vering, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MDU Construction Services Group, Inc. identifying Centennial Energy Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Vering, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by MDU Construction Services Group, Inc., MDU Resources Group, Inc..(Vering, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Capital Electric Construction Company, Inc. identifying MDU Construction Services Group as corporate parent . (Vering, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Capital Electric Construction Company, Inc..(Vering, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Richard Barber upon MDU Resources Group, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/19/2019 (Ralston, Thomas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Richard Barber upon MDU Construction Services Group, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/19/2019 (Ralston, Thomas)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. MDU Construction Services Group, Inc. and MDU Resources Group, Inc. shall have up to and including 8/19/2019 to file their answers or other responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/12/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants MDU Construction Services Group, Inc., MDU Resources Group, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Vering, John)
June 26, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Capital Electric Construction Company, Inc., MDU Construction Services Group, Inc., MDU Resources Group, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Richard Barber - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Ralston, Thomas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Richard Barber. (Ralston, Thomas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4845268.), filed by Richard Barber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ralston, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. Capital Electric Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Electric Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Vering, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDU Construction Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Vering, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDU Resources Group, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Vering, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Barber
Represented By: Thomas F. Ralston
Represented By: Kenneth Donald Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?