Murphy v. Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Plaintiff: Kathy Murphy
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02343
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Motion to Stay Case and Compel Arbitration. Plaintiff has informed the Court that she does not oppose the motion. The Court finds a stay of pretrial proceedings to be appropriate, given the existence of the parties' Mutual Agreement to Arbitrate Claims. Accordingly, all pretrial proceedings are hereby stayed. Counsel for the parties are directed to file a joint status report on May 20, 2020. If the matter is resolved prior to that date, the parties shall notify the Court within 10 days of its resolution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brandon L. Corl on behalf of Kathy Murphy. (Corl, Brandon)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Case and Compel Arbitration by Defendant Greystar Management Services, L.P. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kari Fecht)(Cizmorris, Melissa)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendant is granted leave to answer out of time and shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. 3) on or before August 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/2/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Greystar Management Services, L.P. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Cizmorris, Melissa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Kathy Murphy upon Greystar Management Services, L.P. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019 (Schiavone, Anne)
June 26, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Greystar Management Services, L.P. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Marie McDowell on behalf of Kathy Murphy. (Schiavone, Anne) (Modified on 6/27/2019 to correct attorney in docket text. (heo))
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greystar Management Services, L.P., filed by Kathy Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted A, #2 Exhibit - Redacted B, #3 Exhibit - Redacted C, #4 Exhibit - Redacted D, #5 Exhibit - Redacted E, #6 Exhibit - Redacted F)(Schiavone, Anne)
June 26, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 26, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kathy Murphy. (Schiavone, Anne)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4848182.), filed by Kathy Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted A, #2 Exhibit - Redacted B, #3 Exhibit - Redacted C, #4 Exhibit - Redacted D, #5 Exhibit - Redacted E, #6 Exhibit - Redacted F)(Schiavone, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Murphy
Represented By: Anne W. Schiavone
Represented By: Brandon L. Corl
Represented By: Jessica Marie McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Represented By: Melissa Louise Cizmorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?