Blaser et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jack Blaser, Joseph Esposito, Ellen Embry and Joseph Mattocks
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02345
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Naomi B. Spector on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Spector, Naomi)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Deborah Kravitz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kravitz, Deborah)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Scott A. Kamber on behalf of Jack Blaser, Ellen Embry, Joseph Esposito, Joseph Mattocks. (Kamber, Scott)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion is moot in light of the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A) (ECF No. 2, para. 13) in 19-md-2887. The clerk is directed to refund to counsel any fee submitted with the Affidavit in support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn) Modified to correct the MDL case number in text of entry. (ck)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Deborah Kravitz to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4859266.) by Plaintiffs Jack Blaser, Ellen Embry, Joseph Esposito, Joseph Mattocks (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Lynn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Joseph Mattocks, Jack Blaser, Joseph Esposito, Ellen Embry upon Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B)(Johnson, Lynn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - The following case shall be deemed included in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in accordance with the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A), as modified the Court's June 11, 2019 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines: Blaser, et al. v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2345-JAR-TJJ. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 06/27/2019. (ses)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #4 Order, (Stipulation Agreeing to Transfer) by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Schult, Thomas)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer B. Wieland on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Wieland, Jennifer)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas P. Schult on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Schult, Thomas)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that pursuant to Local Rule 23-A,the parties shall file any notice of related case, or a stipulation agreeing to transfer signed by all parties, no later than seven calendar days from the date of this Order, or by July 3, 2019. The parties only need file any notice of related case or stipulation in this individual action. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/26/2019. (bw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE: Case Number MDL No. 2887 In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation by Jack Blaser, Ellen Embry, Joseph Esposito, Joseph Mattocks (Johnson, Lynn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Jack Blaser, Ellen Embry, Joseph Esposito, Joseph Mattocks. (Johnson, Lynn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4849041.), filed by Joseph Mattocks, Jack Blaser, Joseph Esposito, Ellen Embry.(Johnson, Lynn)
June 26, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 26, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blaser et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Blaser
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Represented By: Scott A. Kamber
Represented By: Naomi B. Spector
Represented By: Deborah Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Esposito
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Represented By: Scott A. Kamber
Represented By: Naomi B. Spector
Represented By: Deborah Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Embry
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Represented By: Scott A. Kamber
Represented By: Naomi B. Spector
Represented By: Deborah Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mattocks
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Represented By: Scott A. Kamber
Represented By: Naomi B. Spector
Represented By: Deborah Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?