Schreiber v. Bunde et al

Plaintiff: Burt Schreiber
Defendant: Fairway Eye Center, Inc, Bunde Investments, Inc., Fairway Eye Center in Leawood, Inc., Mark Bunde, Fairway Eye Center of Overland Park, LLC, Leawood Practice Partnership and Patricia Bunde
Case Number: 2:2019cv02352
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #17 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver addressed to District Court of Johnson County. (ydm)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE Re: Document #17 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver and docket sheet mailed to District Court of Johnson County, Kansas on 7/31/2019 by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number 70161970000113655668. (ydm)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying #15 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 7/31/2019. (ydm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Defendants Mark Bunde, Patricia Bunde, Bunde Investments, Inc., Fairway Eye Center in Leawood, Inc., Fairway Eye Center of Overland Park, LLC, Fairway Eye Center, Inc, Leawood Practice Partnership re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Hausner, Toby)
July 22, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #15 MOTION to Appoint Receiver an immediate stay of litigation and for hearing or alternatively Defendants' Request for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Receiver an immediate stay of litigation and for hearing or alternatively Defendants' Request for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendants Mark Bunde, Patricia Bunde, Bunde Investments, Inc., Fairway Eye Center in Leawood, Inc., Fairway Eye Center of Overland Park, LLC, Fairway Eye Center, Inc, Leawood Practice Partnership (Hausner, Toby)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Burt Schreiber(Lawson, Christopher)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Burt Schreiber (Lawson, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Burt Schreiber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Bunde Declaration)(Lawson, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion for leave to file amended complaint. The motion is granted under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). Plaintiff is directed to file his amended complaint as a separate docket entry forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, by Plaintiff Burt Schreiber (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Lawson, Christopher)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal by Mark Bunde, Patricia Bunde, Bunde Investments, Inc., Fairway Eye Center in Leawood, Inc., Fairway Eye Center of Overland Park, LLC, Fairway Eye Center, Inc, Leawood Practice Partnership re #1 Notice of Removal, (Hausner, Toby)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mark Bunde, Patricia Bunde, Bunde Investments, Inc., Fairway Eye Center in Leawood, Inc., Fairway Eye Center of Overland Park, LLC, Fairway Eye Center, Inc, Leawood Practice Partnership (Hausner, Toby)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Mark Bunde, Patricia Bunde, Bunde Investments, Inc., Fairway Eye Center in Leawood, Inc., Fairway Eye Center of Overland Park, LLC, Fairway Eye Center, Inc, Leawood Practice Partnership - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hausner, Toby)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Mark Bunde, Patricia Bunde, Bunde Investments, Inc., Fairway Eye Center in Leawood, Inc., Fairway Eye Center of Overland Park, LLC, Fairway Eye Center, Inc, Leawood Practice Partnership. (Hausner, Toby)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John J. Schirger on behalf of All Defendants (Schirger, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Matthew W. Lytle on behalf of All Defendants (Lytle, Matthew)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Toby C. Hausner on behalf of All Defendants (Hausner, Toby)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 ***SEE #3 FOR CORRECT FILING*** ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Toby C. Hausner on behalf of All Defendants (Hausner, Toby) Modified on 6/28/2019 (heo).
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 19CV03112 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4850583.), filed by Fairway Eye Center in Leawood, Inc., Patricia Bunde, Bunde Investments, Inc., Mark Bunde, Leawood Practice Partnership, Fairway Eye Center, Inc, Fairway Eye Center of Overland Park, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Pleadings_Case 19cv03112)(Hausner, Toby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schreiber v. Bunde et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairway Eye Center, Inc
Represented By: Matthew W. Lytle
Represented By: John J. Schirger
Represented By: Toby C. Hausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bunde Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. Lytle
Represented By: John J. Schirger
Represented By: Toby C. Hausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairway Eye Center in Leawood, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. Lytle
Represented By: John J. Schirger
Represented By: Toby C. Hausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bunde
Represented By: Matthew W. Lytle
Represented By: John J. Schirger
Represented By: Toby C. Hausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairway Eye Center of Overland Park, LLC
Represented By: Matthew W. Lytle
Represented By: John J. Schirger
Represented By: Toby C. Hausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leawood Practice Partnership
Represented By: Matthew W. Lytle
Represented By: John J. Schirger
Represented By: Toby C. Hausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Bunde
Represented By: Matthew W. Lytle
Represented By: John J. Schirger
Represented By: Toby C. Hausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burt Schreiber
Represented By: Christopher P. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?