Garver v. Principal Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Robert P Garver and Robert P. Garver
Defendant: Principal Life Insurance Company, Duane Roth and The Roth Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02354
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 28 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn C. Bascom on behalf of Principal Life Insurance Company. (Bascom, Kathryn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 27 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Robert P. Garver. (Hart, Brette)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edna S. Kersting as counsel for Principal Life Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/19/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for attorney Edna S. Kersting to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4894980.) by Defendant Principal Life Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Brunkhorst, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Raymond Bourhis for Robert P. Garver pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/16/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Robert P. Garver re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Hart, Brette)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Raymond Bourhis to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4894031.) by Plaintiff Robert P. Garver (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Hart, Brette)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 02:00 PM (CDT) by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 9/18/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 9/18/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/12/19. (aw)
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by Principal Life Insurance Company.(Brunkhorst, Matthew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Duane Roth, The Roth Companies, Inc. (Brandt, W.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Duane Roth, The Roth Companies, Inc. (Brandt, W.)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Bourhis, and #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence Arthur Mann as counsel for Robert P. Garver pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/25/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Lawrence Arthur Mann to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4873453.) by Plaintiff Robert P. Garver (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Hart, Brette) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2019: #1 Motion for PHV) (gw).
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Matthew Bourhis to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4873437.) by Plaintiff Robert P. Garver (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Hart, Brette) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2019: #1 Motion for PHV) (gw).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal (Complaint). Response due on or before August 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/19/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Duane Roth, The Roth Companies, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Nicol, Jonathon)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal (Complaint). Deadline extended to August 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/17/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Principal Life Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Brunkhorst, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 07/19/2019 for Defendants Duane Roth, The Roth Companies, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 07/03/2019. (ca)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by W. Perry Brandt on behalf of Duane Roth, The Roth Companies, Inc.. (Brandt, W.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jonathon D. Nicol on behalf of Duane Roth, The Roth Companies, Inc.. (Nicol, Jonathon)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 07/19/2019 for Defendant Principal Life Insurance Company to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 07/02/2019. (ca)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Principal Life Insurance Company identifying Principal Financial Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Brunkhorst, Matthew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Co-Defendant's Consent to Removal by Principal Life Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Brunkhorst, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendant Principal Life Insurance Company Exhibit B - Policy. (Brunkhorst, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Principal Life Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Brunkhorst, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Principal Life Insurance Company. (Brunkhorst, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas, case number 2019-CV-000430 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4851351.), filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Garver Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit)(Brunkhorst, Matthew) Modified on 6/28/2019 (ca). Per attorney request, incorrect exhibit (B)filed. See docket entry 4 for correct exhibit .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garver v. Principal Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew R. Brunkhorst
Represented By: Kathryn C. Bascom
Represented By: Edna S. Kersting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Roth
Represented By: W. Perry Brandt
Represented By: Jonathon D. Nicol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roth Companies, Inc.
Represented By: W. Perry Brandt
Represented By: Jonathon D. Nicol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert P Garver
Represented By: Brette S. Hart
Represented By: Matthew W. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert P. Garver
Represented By: Brette S. Hart
Represented By: Matthew W. Greenberg
Represented By: Raymond Bourhis
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Mann
Represented By: Matthew Bourhis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?