Marquez et al v. Midwest Division MMC, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Josiah Chumba, Neesha Perez and Tammie Marquez
Defendant: Midwest Division MMC, LLC, Health Midwest Medical Group, Inc., Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC and Health Midwest Ventures Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02362
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Midwest Division MMC, LLC.(Davis, Timothy)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC.(Davis, Timothy)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Health Midwest Medical Group, Inc..(Davis, Timothy)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Health Midwest Ventures Group, Inc..(Davis, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 08/15/2019 for Defendants Health Midwest Medical Group, Inc., Midwest Division MMC, LLC, Health Midwest Ventures Group, Inc., Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 07/31/2019. (ca)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Holdmeyer on behalf of Health Midwest Medical Group, Inc., Health Midwest Ventures Group, Inc., Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC, Midwest Division MMC, LLC (Holdmeyer, Sarah)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Timothy J. Davis on behalf of Health Midwest Medical Group, Inc., Health Midwest Ventures Group, Inc., Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC, Midwest Division MMC, LLC (Davis, Timothy)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Tammie Marquez, Josiah Chumba, Neesha Perez upon Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019 (Mehl, Brittany)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Tammie Marquez, Josiah Chumba, Neesha Perez upon Midwest Division MMC, LLC served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019 (Mehl, Brittany)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Tammie Marquez, Josiah Chumba, Neesha Perez upon Health Midwest Ventures Group, Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019 (Mehl, Brittany)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Tammie Marquez, Josiah Chumba, Neesha Perez upon Health Midwest Medical Group, Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019 (Mehl, Brittany)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by Tammie Marquez, Josiah Chumba, Neesha Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mehl, Brittany)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Health Midwest Medical Group, Inc., Health Midwest Ventures Group, Inc., Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC, Midwest Division MMC, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Josiah Chumba, Tammie Marquez, Neesha Perez. (Mehl, Brittany)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4854491.), filed by Tammie Marquez, Josiah Chumba, Neesha Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mehl, Brittany)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquez et al v. Midwest Division MMC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josiah Chumba
Represented By: Brittany Coughlin Mehl
Represented By: Ryan Paulus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neesha Perez
Represented By: Brittany Coughlin Mehl
Represented By: Ryan Paulus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Marquez
Represented By: Brittany Coughlin Mehl
Represented By: Ryan Paulus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Division MMC, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Davis
Represented By: Sarah Holdmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Midwest Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Davis
Represented By: Sarah Holdmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Davis
Represented By: Sarah Holdmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Midwest Ventures Group, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Davis
Represented By: Sarah Holdmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?