FBB Real Estate 2, LLC v. Meyer et al
Plaintiff: FBB Real Estate 2, LLC
Defendant: Paul W. Meyer and Deer Hunting Farm LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02374
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
2 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re Notice Re Document #7 remanding to state court addressed to Linn County District Court. (hw)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE Re Document #7 Order Remanding to state court and docket sheet mailed to Linn County District Court on 7/17/2019 by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number 7018 0680 0001 8174 0717. (hw)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Stipulation filed by Deer Hunting Farm LLC, Paul W. Meyer. Case is remanded to the District Court of Linn County, Kansas. ***Terminating Case. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/17/19. (hw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, by Deer Hunting Farm LLC, Paul W. Meyer. (Donnelli, Jennifer)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree recused. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/12/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Deer Hunting Farm LLC, Paul W. Meyer - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Donnelli, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Nathan F. Garrett on behalf of Deer Hunting Farm LLC, Paul Meyer. (Garrett, Nathan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Paul Meyer. (Donnelli, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Linn County District Court, case number 2019-CV-000187 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4858867.), filed by Paul Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Donnelli, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FBB Real Estate 2, LLC v. Meyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W. Meyer
Represented By: Nathan F. Garrett
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Donnelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deer Hunting Farm LLC
Represented By: Nathan F. Garrett
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Donnelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FBB Real Estate 2, LLC
Represented By: Andrew W. Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?