Derosa v. American Modern Select Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lucinda W. Derosa
Defendant: American Modern Select Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02380
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #6 Order to Show Cause, by Defendant American Modern Select Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kraushaar, Corey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #6 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Lucinda W. Derosa (Crabb, Michael)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Lucinda W. Derosa of Discovery Responses (Crabb, Michael T.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE by American Modern Select Insurance Company of First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Kraushaar, Corey)
July 24, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Show Cause Response due by 9/9/2019 per #8 Memorandum and Order.(ydm)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #8 Motion for Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED BY THE COURT THAT the parties shall have 30 days from the date of this Order to conduct limited discovery consistent with this Order. The deadline for the parties to respond to the Order to Show Cause (Doc. 6) is amended, and responses now are due on September 9, 2019. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 7/24/2019. (ydm)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Motion to Stay its Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Resolution of Court's Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint within seven (7) days of any ruling on the Order to Show Cause (ECF No. #6 ) finding that this court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
July 19, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #8 MOTION for Discovery and Request for Stay of Ruling on Subject Matter Jurisdiction. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (mn)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Discovery and Request for Stay of Ruling on Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant American Modern Select Insurance Company (Kraushaar, Corey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Deadlines for Defendant's Responsive Pleading Pending Resolution of Court's Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant American Modern Select Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Kraushaar, Corey)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The court orders American Modern and Ms. Derosa to file written responses, within 14 days from the filing date of this Order, explaining why the court should not remand this case because it lacks subject matter jurisdiction. If American Modern does not timely respond, the court will enter an order promptly remanding the case to the District Court of Johnson County, Kansas. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/16/2019. (mig)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE by American Modern Select Insurance Company of Notice of Removal to State Court (Kraushaar, Corey)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SERVICE by American Modern Select Insurance Company of Notice of Removal to Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Kraushaar, Corey)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Modern Select Insurance Company identifying American Modern Home Insurance Company; American Modern Insurance Group; The Midland Company; Munich American Holding, Corp.; and Munchener Ruckversicherungs-Gesellschaft Aktiengesellschaft as corporate parent . (Kraushaar, Corey)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant American Modern Select Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Kraushaar, Corey)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson County, case number 19cv-03174 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4860765.), filed by American Modern Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Records Complete Copy of State Court File)(Kraushaar, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derosa v. American Modern Select Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda W. Derosa
Represented By: Michael T. Crabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Modern Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew G. Koehler
Represented By: Corey L. Kraushaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?