Ireton v. Moore Freight Service, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tina Ireton
Defendant: Moore Freight Service, Inc. and Daseke, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02381
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Daseke, Inc., Moore Freight Service, Inc. (Sheffield, Robert)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Daseke, Inc., Moore Freight Service, Inc. (Sheffield, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 08/27/2019 for Defendant Daseke, Inc., and extending time until 09/03/2019 for defendant Moore Freight Service, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 08/07/2019. (ca)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Tina Ireton upon Moore Freight Service, Inc. served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019 (McCoy, Brant)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Tina Ireton upon Daseke, Inc. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019 (McCoy, Brant)
July 22, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daseke, Inc., Moore Freight Service, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Documents (Complaint's Exhibits D,E,F,G, and J) are not redacted properly. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Tina Ireton. (McCoy, Brant)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4861253.), filed by Tina Ireton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(McCoy, Brant) Modified on 7/12/2019 (ca). Exhibits D, E, F, G, and J are blocked from public view due to violation of privacy policy. (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2019: #11 Redacted Exhibit D, #12 Redacted Exhibit E, #13 Redacted Exhibit F, #14 Redacted Exhibit G, #15 Redacted Exhibit J) (ca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ireton v. Moore Freight Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore Freight Service, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa M. Sediqzad
Represented By: Robert A. Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daseke, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa M. Sediqzad
Represented By: Robert A. Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Ireton
Represented By: Brant A. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?