Bicknell v. Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: lora bicknell
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC, FBCS, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC and Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02417
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc. and Midland Funding LLC shall have until September 20, 2019 to file their answers or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/6/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midland Funding, LLC identifying Encore Capital Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Dickinson, Joshua)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint (attorney) (Defendants' Joint) by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Dickinson, Joshua)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom (Unknown) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 9/18/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 10/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/27/2019. (jal)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 09/06/2019 for Defendant Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 08/23/2019. (ca)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc. . (Woofter, Hannah)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Hannah L. Woofter on behalf of Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc.. (Woofter, Hannah)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Paul M. Croker on behalf of Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc.. (Croker, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kersten L. Holzhueter on behalf of Midland Funding, LLC. (Holzhueter, Kersten)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until September 6, 2019 for Defendant Midland Funding, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 08/22/2019. (tvn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Lora Bicknell upon Midland Funding, LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 (Callahan, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Lora Bicknell upon Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 (Callahan, Ryan)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David J. Phillips and Mary E. Phillips for Lora Bicknell pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 07/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Mary E. Philipps in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re 5 Order,, #4 MOTION for attorney David J. Philipps, Mary E. Philipps to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $100, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4868054.) by Lora Bicknell. (Callahan, Ryan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of David J. Philipps in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re 5 Order,, #4 MOTION for attorney David J. Philipps, Mary E. Philipps to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $100, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4868054.) by Lora Bicknell. (Callahan, Ryan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 (PLEASE DISREGARD - DUPLICATE FILING OF DE #7) AFFIDAVIT of Mary E. Philipps in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re 5 Order,, #4 MOTION for attorney David J. Philipps, Mary E. Philipps to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $100, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4868054.) by Lora Bicknell. (Callahan, Ryan) Modified on 7/29/2019 (hw).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The single affidavit submitted by attorneys David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps does not comply with D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4. The court directs local counsel to file separate, amended affidavits with the clerk's office by July 29, 2019 that are either notarized or contain a declaration that the affidavit is being signed under penalty of perjury in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1746. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/22/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
July 22, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
July 22, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney David J. Philipps, Mary E. Philipps to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $100, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4868054.) by Plaintiff lora bicknell (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form, #3 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Callahan, Ryan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4868047.), filed by lora bicknell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Callahan, Ryan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff lora bicknell - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Callahan, Ryan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff lora bicknell. (Callahan, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bicknell v. Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBCS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Kersten L. Holzhueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Represented By: Hannah L. Woofter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: lora bicknell
Represented By: Ryan M. Callahan
Represented By: James Crump
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?