Malone v. Rainbow Cakes, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Layla Malone
Defendant: Rainbow Cakes, Inc, IHOP Restaurants, LLC and Martin Leon
Case Number: 2:2019cv02432
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Separate Defendants Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Plaintiff Layla Malone by IHOP Restaurants, LLC, Martin Leon, Rainbow Cakes, Inc.(Bartalos, Molly)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IHOP Restaurants, LLC, Martin Leon, Rainbow Cakes, Inc . (Bartalos, Molly)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Emmalee Michelle Terry on behalf of IHOP Restaurants, LLC, Martin Leon, Rainbow Cakes, Inc. (Terry, Emmalee)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Molly Brown Bartalos on behalf of IHOP Restaurants, LLC, Martin Leon, Rainbow Cakes, Inc. (Bartalos, Molly)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Carlos Murguia recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/6/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
August 1, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Martin Leon. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
July 26, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Documents (Exhibits A & B of the Complaint) are not redacted properly. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 26, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Layla Malone - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Cusick, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Layla Malone. (Cusick, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4873695.), filed by Layla Malone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Malone Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Right-to-Sue)(Barnes, Kenneth) Modified on 7/26/2019 (ca). Exhibits A and B are blocked from public view due to violation of the privacy policy. (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #3 Redacted Exhibit A Malone Charge of Discrimination, #4 Redacted Exhibit B Notice of Right-to-Sue) (ca). Modified on 7/29/2019 to add redacted copies of Exhibits A and B (ca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone v. Rainbow Cakes, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Layla Malone
Represented By: John M. Cusick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow Cakes, Inc
Represented By: Molly Brown Bartalos
Represented By: Emmalee Michelle Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHOP Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: Molly Brown Bartalos
Represented By: Emmalee Michelle Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Leon
Represented By: Molly Brown Bartalos
Represented By: Emmalee Michelle Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?