United States of America v. Lamb et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Nichole Lamb, Unknown Spouse of Nichole Lamb and Nichole S. Lamb-Stowe
Case Number: 2:2019cv02433
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Service by Publication. Service by publication is ordered on the Unknown Spouse of Nichole Lamb a/k/a Nichole S. Lamb-Stowe, and said spouse is ordered to appear on or before 10/24/19. See order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/29/19. (adc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service by Publication by Plaintiff United States of America (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Taylor, Andrea)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Nichole Lamb waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Taylor, Andrea)
July 26, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Taylor, Andrea)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Taylor, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lamb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Nichole Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole S. Lamb-Stowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Andrea L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?