Simmons v. Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shontil Simmons
Defendant: Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc. and Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02437
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc., Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc. re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, III, IV and V of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend (Russell, Kyle)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: In light of the pending Motion to Dismiss certain counts of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 14) and the Court's order permitting Defendant to defer filing an answer until the District Judge has ruled on the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 17), the Court will not set a Scheduling Conference at this time. Instead, a Status Conference is set for 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Shontil Simmons re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, III, IV and V of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Gray, Gerald)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Motion to Defer Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(4)(A), Defendants shall file their responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Section 1981 claims (Counts II and V) and to any other claims that remain pending following the District Judge's ruling on Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 14) within 14 days after the ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/30/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Order to Defer Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc., Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Russell, Kyle)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, III, IV and V of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc., Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc.(Russell, Kyle)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, III, IV and V of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc., Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc. (Russell, Kyle)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER finding as moot Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc. and Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #6 ). Defendants' motion seeks dismissal of plaintiff's original Complaint (Doc. 1). Plaintiff since has filed a First Amended Complaint as a matter of course under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) (Doc. 12). Thus, defendants' Motion to Dismiss the original Complaint is moot. The court thus denies defendants' Motion to Dismiss as moot but without prejudice to any renewed motion seeking to dismiss plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/23/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shontil Simmons, filed by Shontil Simmons.(Gray, Gerald)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas P. Murphy for Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc. and Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 08/15/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Thomas Murphy to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4892673.) by Defendants Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc., Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas Murphy in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Russell, Kyle)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Motion to Defer Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(4)(A), Defendants shall file their responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Section 1981 claims (Counts I and V) and to any other claims that remain pending following the District Judge's ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 6) within 14 days after the ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Defer Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint) by Defendants Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc., Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Russell, Kyle)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts I, III, IV, and V of Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc., Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc.(Russell, Kyle)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts I, III, IV, and V of Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc., Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc. (Russell, Kyle)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Johnson County. (Russell, Kyle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc., Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc. . (Russell, Kyle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc., Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Russell, Kyle)
July 29, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 29, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc., Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc.. (Russell, Kyle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, case number 19CV03371 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4876153.), filed by Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc., Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Return of Service)(Russell, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shontil Simmons
Represented By: Gerald Gray, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Represented By: Camille L. Roe
Represented By: Thomas P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Represented By: Camille L. Roe
Represented By: Thomas P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?