Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. v. Gwaltney, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. - DBA Kingspan ASI, United States of America for the use and benefit of Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. - dba Kingspan ASI and Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc.
Defendant: Gwaltney, LLC - dba Diamond Roofing, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Walsh Federal, LLC, Gwaltney, LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02451
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joel D. Heusinger and Kari F. Scheer for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Walsh Federal, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Kari Scheer re: motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #25 by Defendants Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Walsh Federal, LLC. (gw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Joel D. Heusinger re: motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #25 by Defendants Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Walsh Federal, LLC. (gw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Walsh Federal, LLC. Amendment to #26 Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, Joel Heusinger. (Cline, Amy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Walsh Federal, LLC. Amendment to #27 Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, Kari Scheer. (Cline, Amy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Kari Scheer re #25 MOTION for attorney Joel D. Heusinger to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $100, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4919397.) by Defendants Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Walsh Federal, LLC(Cline, Amy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Joel Heusinger re #25 MOTION for attorney Joel D. Heusinger to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $100, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4919397.) by Defendants Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Walsh Federal, LLC(Cline, Amy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for attorney Joel D. Heusinger and Kari Scheer to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $100, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4919397.) by Defendants Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Walsh Federal, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Cline, Amy) Modified on 9/13/2019 to add attorney Kari Scheer requesting to appear PHV.(ydm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 24 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey D. Leonard on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Walsh Federal, LLC (Leonard, Jeffrey)
September 12, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Amy Fellows Cline on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Walsh Federal, LLC (Cline, Amy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 22 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/07/2019 for Defendants Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Gwaltney, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/12/2019. (gw)
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc.. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company waiver sent on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Schimmel, Charles)
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc.. Walsh Federal, LLC waiver sent on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Schimmel, Charles)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, filed by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc..(Schimmel, Charles)
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. upon Employers Mutual Casualty Company served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019 (Schimmel, Charles)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. upon Travelers Casualty and Surety Company served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019 (Schimmel, Charles)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. upon Walsh Federal, LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019 (Schimmel, Charles)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian R. Lambert for Employers Mutual Casualty Company and Gwaltney, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/4/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Brian R. Lambert re: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #13 .(gw)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Brian R. Lambert to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4911274.) by Defendants Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Gwaltney, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Cotney, Trenton)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Trenton H. Cotney on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Gwaltney, LLC. (Cotney, Trenton)
August 28, 2019 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gwaltney, LLC. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 27, 2019 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Walsh Federal, LLC. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc..(Schimmel, Charles)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. upon Employers Mutual Casualty Company served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 (Schimmel, Charles)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. upon Travelers Casualty and Surety Company served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 (Schimmel, Charles)
August 15, 2019 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ydm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. upon Employers Mutual Casualty Company served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019 (Schimmel, Charles)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. upon Walsh Federal, LLC served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019 (Schimmel, Charles)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. upon Travelers Casualty and Surety Company served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019 (Schimmel, Charles)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. upon Gwaltney, LLC served on 8/10/2019, answer due 9/3/2019 (Schimmel, Charles)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. identifying Kingspan-MedUSA, Inc., Kingspan Holdings Panels US Inc., and Kingspan Holdings (North America) LTD as corporate parent . (Schimmel, Charles)
August 7, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Gwaltney, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Walsh Federal, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 7, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. - DBA Kingspan ASI, United States of America for the use and benefit of Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. - dba Kingspan ASI - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Schimmel, Charles)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. - DBA Kingspan ASI, United States of America for the use and benefit of Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. - dba Kingspan ASI. (Schimmel, Charles)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-4884407.), filed by United States of America for the use and benefit of Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. - dba Kingspan ASI, Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. - DBA Kingspan ASI.(Schimmel, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. v. Gwaltney, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwaltney, LLC - dba Diamond Roofing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Trenton H. Cotney
Represented By: Brian R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walsh Federal, LLC
Represented By: Amy Fellows Cline
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Leonard
Represented By: Joel D. Heusinger
Represented By: Kari F. Scheer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwaltney, LLC
Represented By: Trenton H. Cotney
Represented By: Brian R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Amy Fellows Cline
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Leonard
Represented By: Joel D. Heusinger
Represented By: Kari F. Scheer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. - DBA Kingspan ASI
Represented By: Charles T. Schimmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use and benefit of Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. - dba Kingspan ASI
Represented By: Charles T. Schimmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc.
Represented By: Charles T. Schimmel
Represented By: W. Greg Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?