Dorch v. Magna Automotive Systems
Plaintiff: Jamaal M. Dorch
Defendant: Magna Automotive Systems
Case Number: 2:2019cv02458
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 9/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 09/04/19. Mailed to pro se party by certified mail. (jc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jamaal M. Dorch re #5 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(hw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #5 Order addressed to Jamaal Dorch. (hw)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The motion for appointment of counsel is denied. By August 26, 2019, plaintiff shall supplement the documents for the motion to proceed without prepayment of fees. Also by August 26, 2019, plaintiff shall show cause in writing to the presiding U.S. District Judge, Carlos Murguia, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 08/12/19. Mailed to pro se party by certified mail. (jc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Jamaal M. Dorch (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (ca)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Jamaal M. Dorch (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Jamaal M. Dorch. (ca)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Jamaal M. Dorch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorch v. Magna Automotive Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamaal M. Dorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magna Automotive Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?