Warner v. Lineage Logistics, LLC
Plaintiff: Japheth Warner
Defendant: Lineage Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02461
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion to Stay Case. This lawsuit is stayed pending the parties' submission of this case to arbitration and the outcome of the arbitration proceeding. However, the Court orders the parties to submit periodic reports on the status of arbitration. Such a status report is due 12/12/19. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/13/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Arbitration by Defendant Lineage Logistics, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Agreement)(Boatright, Daniel)
August 19, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lineage Logistics, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 8/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A redacted version of #1 Complaint - Exhibit 1 has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes ONLY. (hw)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Document is not redacted properly. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
August 9, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Japheth Warner. (Rickley, Kathryn)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4888477.), filed by Japheth Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter)(Rickley, Kathryn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #3 Exhibit EEOC Charge - Redacted) (hw). Modified on 8/12/2019 to add redacted version of Exhibit 1. Original contained personal information and is blocked from public view (hw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Lineage Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Japheth Warner
Represented By: Kathryn J. Starrett Rickley
Represented By: Matthew Edward Osman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lineage Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Boatright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?